This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/20/2021 at 07:16:20 (UTC).

Peleus Insurance Company v. Avo Construction LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 Peleus Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Avo Construction LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Allyne R. Ross and Cheryl L. Pollak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04129

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Allyne R. Ross

Referral Judge

Cheryl L. Pollak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peleus Insurance Company

Defendants

Avo Construction LLC

19 Richardson Street, LLC

Beverly Bracker

Charles F. Salley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Walsh

Attorney at London Fischer LLP

59 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

William J. Edwins

Attorney at London Fischer LLP

59 Maiden Lane, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

Defendant Attorneys

Dan David Kohane

Attorney at Hurwitz & Fine P.C.

1300 Liberty Building

Buffalo, NY 14202

Lee S. Siegel

Attorney at Hurwitz & Fine, P.C.

575 Broad Hollow Rd

Melvile, NY 11747

Jack Glanzberg

Attorney at Aboulafia Law Firm

170 Hamilton Avenuesuite 203

White Plains, NY 10601

Matthew S. Aboulafia

Attorney at Aboulafia Law Firm, LLC

170 Hamilton Avenuesuite 203

White Plains, NY 10601

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

18 #3

summons issued

18 #2

summons issued

18 #1

summons issued

18 #18

Main Document

#17

#16

#15

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Glanzberg on behalf of Beverly Bracker, Charles F. Salley (aty to be noticed) (Glanzberg, Jack) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Aboulafia on behalf of Beverly Bracker, Charles F. Salley (aty to be noticed) (Aboulafia, Matthew) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO ANSWER re #26 So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 9/13/2021. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STIPULATION extending time to answer by Beverly Bracker (Landa, Yolanda) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEmail Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by James Walsh on behalf of Peleus Insurance Company (notification declined or already on case) (Walsh, James) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by James Walsh on behalf of Peleus Insurance Company (notification declined or already on case) (Walsh, James) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO ANSWER re #23 So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 9/8/2021. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, extending time to answer, move or otherwise respond by Avo Construction LLC (Siegel, Lee) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 11/9/2021 @ 11:15 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 11:15 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 21-4129. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 9/8/2021. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons. by Peleus Insurance Company (Edwins, William) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons. by Peleus Insurance Company (Edwins, William) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/29/2021) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Peleus Insurance Company (Edwins, William) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Peleus Insurance Company. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Peleus Insurance Company (Edwins, William) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Avo Construction LLC, 19 Richardson Street, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14682955 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES, filed by Peleus Insurance Company. (Edwins, William) Modified on 7/22/2021 (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peleus Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack Glanzberg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee Scott Siegel