This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:04:51 (UTC).

Pekin Life Insurance Company v. Olena et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Contract - Insurance case was filed by Pekin Life Insurance Company against Olena in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05645

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pekin Life Insurance Company

Defendants

Crain Funeral Home & Cremation Service

Kimberly Olena

Tammy Woodworth

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) MOTION by Defendant Tammy Woodworth for summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Tammy Woodworth's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Liao, Eileen) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit D (Req to Change Beneficiary Form - Tammy Woodworth as sole beneficiary)

1 #3

Exhibit C (Pekin letter to Insured)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Motion by Robert Marc Chemers for presentment of motion for entry of default #26 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/31/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#26

(#26) MOTION by Plaintiff Pekin Life Insurance Company for entry of default Motion for Entry of Judgment Against Defaulted Defendant (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Certificate of Service)(Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#23

(#23) RULE 56 1 Statement by Tammy Woodworth regarding motion for summary judgment #22 (Liao, Eileen) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A (Life Insurance Policy)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Interpleader filed by Pekin Life Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16161777. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Life Insurance Policy), #2 Exhibit B (Request to Change Beneficiary Form - Kimberly and Tammy as beneficiaries)), #3 Exhibit C (Pekin letter to Insured), #4 Exhibit D (Req to Change Beneficiary Form - Tammy Woodworth as sole beneficiary), #5 Exhibit E (7-11-19 Pekin Letter to Insured), #6 Exhibit F (Assignment), #7 Exhibit G (Certificate of Death), #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit F (Assignment)

1 #2

Exhibit B (Request to Change Beneficiary Form - Kimberly and Tammy as beneficiar

22 #1

Memorandum in Support of Defendant Tammy Woodworth's Motion for Summary Ju

26 #1

Receipt

26 #2

Certificate of Service

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Motion by Eileen Liao for presentment of motion for summary judgment #22 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/24/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Liao, Eileen) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#25

(#25) Amended NOTICE of Motion by Eileen Liao for presentment of motion for summary judgment #22 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/24/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Liao, Eileen) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit E (7-11-19 Pekin Letter to Insured)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G (Certificate of Death)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Motion by Robert Marc Chemers for presentment of motion for entry of default #26 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/31/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION by Plaintiff Pekin Life Insurance Company for entry of default Motion for Entry of Judgment Against Defaulted Defendant (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Certificate of Service)(Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Amended NOTICE of Motion by Eileen Liao for presentment of motion for summary judgment #22 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/24/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Liao, Eileen) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Motion by Eileen Liao for presentment of motion for summary judgment #22 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/24/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Liao, Eileen) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) RULE 56 1 Statement by Tammy Woodworth regarding motion for summary judgment #22 (Liao, Eileen) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION by Defendant Tammy Woodworth for summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Tammy Woodworth's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Liao, Eileen) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tammy Woodworth by Andrew Charles Tidwell-neal (Tidwell-neal, Andrew) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • BOND in the amount of $ $50,198.80, Receipt no. 4624231902 posted by Pekin Life Insurance Company (jn, ) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/15/2019. Mailed notice (lma, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for entry of an order of default #16 is granted; defendant Crain Funeral Home & Cremation Service is held in default for failure to respond to the complaint in a timely fashion after service of process. Plaintiff's motion to deposit funds #14 is also granted; plaintiff is directed to provide the Court with a draft order consistent with the motion, in Word format, via Judge Kennelly's proposed order e-mail address. The motion hearing date of 10/9/2019 is vacated. (mk) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tammy Woodworth by Frederick John Sudekum, III (Sudekum, Frederick) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tammy Woodworth by Eileen Liao (Liao, Eileen) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pekin Life Insurance Company as to Crain Funeral Home & Cremation Service on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pekin Life Insurance Company as to Tammy Woodworth on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(kp, ) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pekin Life Insurance Company as to Tammy Woodworth on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pekin Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Crain Funeral Home & Cremation Service, Kimberly Olena, Tammy Woodworth (mc, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pekin Life Insurance Company by Robert Marc Chemers (Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Interpleader filed by Pekin Life Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16161777. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Life Insurance Policy), #2 Exhibit B (Request to Change Beneficiary Form - Kimberly and Tammy as beneficiaries)), #3 Exhibit C (Pekin letter to Insured), #4 Exhibit D (Req to Change Beneficiary Form - Tammy Woodworth as sole beneficiary), #5 Exhibit E (7-11-19 Pekin Letter to Insured), #6 Exhibit F (Assignment), #7 Exhibit G (Certificate of Death), #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.