This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2020 at 09:52:23 (UTC).

Peinhopf v. Leon Guerrero et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Peinhopf filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Leon Guerrero. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Guam District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael J. Bordallo and Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael J. Bordallo

Presiding Judge

Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Peinhopf

Defendants

Arthur San Agustine

Lourdes A. Leon Guerrero

Lourdes Leon Guerrero

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas J. Fisher

Attorney at Fisher & Associates, P.C

167 East Marine Corps Drive, Suite 101

Hagatna, GU 96910

Rachel M. Taimanao-Ayuyu

Attorney at Law Office of Rachel Taimanao-Ayuyu

167 East Marine Corps Drive

Hagatna, GU 96910

Defendant Attorneys

James L. Canto, II

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Guam

590 S. Marine Corps Drive, Ste 706

Tamuning, GU 96913

Robert M. Weinberg

590 S. Marine Corps Drive, Ste 706

Tamuning, GU 96913

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

11 #1

Certificate of Service

#11

#10

#8

7 #1

Affidavit

#7

6 #1

Affidavit

#6

5 #1

Affidavit

#5

#4

3 #1

Affidavit

#3

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Request for Hearing (related documents #10 Motion to Dismiss ). filed by All Plaintiffs. (Taimanao-Ayuyu, Rachel) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 12/31/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2021 at 10:15 AM in 3rd floor courtroom VTC before US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo. (fad, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Reply to Response re #11 OPPOSITION TO A #10 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by All Defendants. (Weinberg, Robert) **Modified on 11/16/2020 to edit docket text and add relation to document no. 10** (fad, ). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) OPPOSITION TO A #10 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Thomas Peinhopf. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Taimanao-Ayuyu, Rachel) **Modified on 11/16/2020 to correct event type, edit docket text and add relation to document no. 10** (fad, ). (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Weinberg, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #4 Notice of Attorney Appearance. A careful review of the Appearance of Counsel on Behalf of All Defendants with docket entry no. #4 , reflects that the document was e-filed by Robert Weinberg, but signed by James L. Canto, II. Although no action will be taken at this time regarding this issue, counsel are advised to consult the Administrative Procedures for the Electronic Filing, Signing, Verifying and Serving of Civil and Criminal Documents adopted by General Order No. 18-0022 on November 19, 2018. (fad, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Declaration of Service - Office of the Attorney General served with #1 Complaint on 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Taimanao-Ayuyu, Rachel) **Modified on 9/25/2020 to edit docket text** (fad, ). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First Summons Returned Executed by Thomas Peinhopf. Arthur San Agustine (personal capacity) served on 9/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Taimanao-Ayuyu, Rachel) **Modified on 9/25/2020 to edit docket text** (fad, ). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First Summons Returned Executed Arthur San Agustine in his official capacity served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. by Thomas Peinhopf. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Taimanao-Ayuyu, Rachel) **Modified on 9/25/2020 to edit docket text** (fad, ). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First Summons Returned Executed by Thomas Peinhopf. Lourdes Leon Guerrero, in her individual capacity served on 9/23/2020(Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Taimanao-Ayuyu, Rachel) **Modified on 9/25/2020 to edit docket text** (fad, ). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Attorney Appearance James L. Canto, II by All Defendants. (Weinberg, Robert) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) First Summons Returned Executed Lourdes A. Leon Guerrero in her official capacity served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. by Thomas Peinhopf. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Taimanao-Ayuyu, Rachel) **Modified on 9/25/2020 to edit docket text** (fad, ). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number GUX016583 re #1 Complaint, (fad, ) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Lourdes A. Leon Guerrero, Arthur San Agustine. (fad, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PENDING.), filed by Thomas Peinhopf. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 11/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Taimanao-Ayuyu, Rachel) **Modified on 9/22/2020 to edit docket text** (fad, ). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James L. Canto, II