This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2023 at 10:09:47 (UTC).

Peery v. Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 Peery filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00139

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Peery

Defendants

Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana

Jacob Grindstaff

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Steven Humphreys

Defendant Attorneys

Johali Mulibinge Muzaliwa

Colin R. Batchelor

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 04/05/2023. (jmb, ) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#11

(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Jacob Grindstaff, Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Batchelor, Colin) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER ON CLOSING DOCUMENTS. ORDERED that, on or before April 24, 2023, all parties shall submit to the court all papers necessary for the closing of this case and its removal from the active docket of this court. It is further ORDERED that the April 28, 2023 Scheduling Conference and all associated deadlines are ABATED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/23/2023. (daj, ) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Settlement by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana (Batchelor, Colin) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#8

(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order/RR #12 sent to Jerri Dawn Bradford returned marked, "RETURN TO SENDER - NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FORWARD". (daj, ) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/13/2023. Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2023 02:15 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/9/2023. (daj, ) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Michael Peery Certificate of Interested Persons (Humphreys, Mark) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Peery.(Humphreys, Mark) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/27/2023. (daj, ) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#3

(#3) ***ORIGINAL PETITION FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against Jacob Grindstaff, Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana, filed by Michael Peery.(daj, ) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana (Batchelor, Colin) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

1 #11

Supplement Cover Sheet Attorney Info

1 #7

Exhibit C-4 Return of Service Grindstaff

1 #6

Exhibit C-3-Citation Return-Safeco

1 #2

Exhibit B-Collinc County Register of Actions

1 #1

Exhibit A-Index of All documents filed in State Court

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 04/05/2023. (jmb, ) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Jacob Grindstaff, Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Batchelor, Colin) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER ON CLOSING DOCUMENTS. ORDERED that, on or before April 24, 2023, all parties shall submit to the court all papers necessary for the closing of this case and its removal from the active docket of this court. It is further ORDERED that the April 28, 2023 Scheduling Conference and all associated deadlines are ABATED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/23/2023. (daj, ) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Settlement by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana (Batchelor, Colin) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order/RR #12 sent to Jerri Dawn Bradford returned marked, "RETURN TO SENDER - NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FORWARD". (daj, ) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/13/2023. Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2023 02:15 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/9/2023. (daj, ) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Michael Peery Certificate of Interested Persons (Humphreys, Mark) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Peery.(Humphreys, Mark) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/27/2023. (daj, ) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***ORIGINAL PETITION FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against Jacob Grindstaff, Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana, filed by Michael Peery.(daj, ) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, ) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (daj, ) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana (Batchelor, Colin) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana, Jacob Grindstaff from 47th Judicial Court-Collin County, Texas, case number 471-00127-2023. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9368694), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana, Jacob Grindstaff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Index of All documents filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit B-Collinc County Register of Actions, #3 Exhibit C-Plaintiff's Original Petition, #4 Exhibit C-1-Citation Issued Safeco, #5 Exhibit C-2-Citation Issued Grindstaff, #6 Exhibit C-3-Citation Return-Safeco, #7 Exhibit C-4 Return of Service Grindstaff, #8 Exhibit D-Collin County CAD, #9 Exhibit E-Policy Dec Page, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Supplement Cover Sheet Attorney Info)(Batchelor, Colin) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less