Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2020 at 08:31:41 (UTC).

Peerson v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 Peerson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert T. Dawson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-06038

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert T. Dawson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ron Peerson

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amanda L Washington

Attorney at McGlynn Glisson & Mouton

340 Florida St.

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH

Suite 1700, 201 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363

Graham C. Talley

Attorney at Mitchell William Selig Gates Woodyard PLLC

425 W. Capitol Street, Suite 1800

Little Rock, AR 72201

Andrea Shwayri Ferraro

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

777 S. Flagler Dr., Ste 300-East

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Lyn Peeples Pruitt

Attorney at Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard

425 West Capitol Ave., Suite 1800

Little Rock, AR 72201-3525

Lindsay Macdonald

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, P.A

777 S. Flagler Dr., Suite 300E

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Temporarily and All Pre-Trial Deadlines and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Macdonald on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Macdonald, Lindsay) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Shwayri Ferraro on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ferraro, Andrea) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION of Richard North to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel Following Remand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Graham C. Talley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lyn Peeples Pruitt on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01822. Docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#5

(#5) SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/21/2020)

#4

(#4) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#3

(#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/12/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16671944 filed by Ron Peerson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Joint Motion to Temporarily Stay Discovery and All Pre-Trial Deadlines. These proceedings are stayed through July 31, 2020 so that the parties may continue settlement negotiations. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on April 30, 2020. (mcc) Modified on 5/1/2020 to add text (lw). (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Temporarily and All Pre-Trial Deadlines and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Macdonald on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Macdonald, Lindsay) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Shwayri Ferraro on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ferraro, Andrea) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel Following Remand. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. is withdrawn, and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove his name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on April 7, 2020. (mcc) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION of Richard North to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel Following Remand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Graham C. Talley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lyn Peeples Pruitt on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketTEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: All attorneys representing parties in this case must be registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas. An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (hnc) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01822. Docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketREMARK: Case Transferred to the Western District of Arkansas via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-01822-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16671944 filed by Ron Peerson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda L Washington