This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2022 at 07:15:40 (UTC).

PEEPLES v. ALLEN et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 PEEPLES filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against ALLEN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are LACEY A COLLIER and ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-04646

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LACEY A COLLIER

Referral Judge

ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EARL PHILLIP PEEPLES

Punta Gorda, FL 33955

Defendants

ALLEN

BROWN

COLONEL

CAPTAIN

WARWICK

DODSON

TETRASTAT

LURRY

ARRINGTON

HORTEN

LT

KLINZ

DR

FRANCO

BAY

ERICKSON

NURSE

MCNEALY

MENTAL HEALTH COUNSELOR

22 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (titled "Motion for Emergency Counsel") against All Defendants, filed by EARL PHILLIP PEEPLES. (No service copies, IFP motion, or fees received.) (jfj) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER re #1 Complaint. The clerk of court is directed to send Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners, a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate approved for use in the Northern District. This case number should be written on the forms. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must either pay the $402.00 filing fee or file a fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis with the requisite prisoner consent form and financial certificate and a computer printout of the transactions in his inmate account for the preceding six-month period. Additionally, within that time, Plaintiff must file an amended civil rights complaint, which must be typed or clearly written, submitted on the court form, and titled "Amended Complaint."( Amended complaint due by 1/28/2022., IFP/Filing fee due by 1/28/2022.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 12/29/2021. (jcw)(Forms sent as ordered.) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER re: Plaintiff's Letter to The Clerk of Court. The clerk of court is directed to provide to Alexandria E. Williams, Assistant General Counsel, Florida Department of Corrections, 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500, a copy of this order and a copy of Plaintiff's letter. The clerk of court must then return the letter to Plaintiff, without docketing, along with a copy of this order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 01/07/22. (Documents mailed as directed.) (jfj) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION titled "Emergency Injunction" by EARL PHILLIP PEEPLES. (jfj) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time by EARL PHILLIP PEEPLES. (jfj) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Change of Address by EARL PHILLIP PEEPLES. (Plaintiff's new address is: CHARLOTTE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 33123 OIL WELL ROAD, PUNTA GORDA, FL 33955. Clerk has updated address in case on CM-ECF.) (jfj) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Injunction by EARL PHILLIP PEEPLES. (jfj) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #9 MOTION for Injunction by EARL PHILLIP PEEPLES. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (jfj) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Injunction by EARL PHILLIP PEEPLES. (jfj) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 4/28/2022. Fee or IFP Motion due by 4/28/2022, per 8 Order. (jfj) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT the deadline for Plaintiff to file an amended complaint on the court form and either pay the filing fee or file an IFP motion is extended to APRIL 28, 2022. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 02/01/2022. (jmw) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time by EARL PHILLIP PEEPLES. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (jfj) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Change of Address by EARL PHILLIP PEEPLES. (Plaintiff's new address is: CHARLOTTE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 33123 OIL WELL ROAD, PUNTA GORDA, FL 33955. Clerk has updated address in case on CM-ECF.) (jfj) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time by EARL PHILLIP PEEPLES. (jfj) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION titled "Emergency Injunction" by EARL PHILLIP PEEPLES. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (jfj) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION titled "Emergency Injunction" by EARL PHILLIP PEEPLES. (jfj) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER re: Plaintiff's Letter to The Clerk of Court. The clerk of court is directed to provide to Alexandria E. Williams, Assistant General Counsel, Florida Department of Corrections, 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500, a copy of this order and a copy of Plaintiff's letter. The clerk of court must then return the letter to Plaintiff, without docketing, along with a copy of this order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 01/07/22. (Documents mailed as directed.) (jfj) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER re #1 Complaint. The clerk of court is directed to send Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners, a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate approved for use in the Northern District. This case number should be written on the forms. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must either pay the $402.00 filing fee or file a fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis with the requisite prisoner consent form and financial certificate and a computer printout of the transactions in his inmate account for the preceding six-month period. Additionally, within that time, Plaintiff must file an amended civil rights complaint, which must be typed or clearly written, submitted on the court form, and titled "Amended Complaint."( Amended complaint due by 1/28/2022., IFP/Filing fee due by 1/28/2022.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 12/29/2021. (jcw)(Forms sent as ordered.) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Docket(#2) Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (jfj) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (jfj) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (titled "Motion for Emergency Counsel") against All Defendants, filed by EARL PHILLIP PEEPLES. (No service copies, IFP motion, or fees received.) (jfj) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARRINGTON is a litigant

Latest cases where DODSON is a litigant

Latest cases where Colonel is a litigant

Latest cases where WARWICK is a litigant