This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:16:57 (UTC).

Pedro Hernandez v. Capital One et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Finance - Consumer Credit case was filed by Pedro Hernandez against Capital One in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, California Central District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-07354

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

George H. Wu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pedro Hernandez

Defendants

Does 1-5

Capital One

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Pedro Hernandez. (ghap) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued as to defendant Capital One. re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 (vm) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07354 GW(MRWx). (rn) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (vm) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

1 #2

Summons

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

1 #1

CV-71

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pedro Hernandez. (ghap) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants Capital One, Does 1-5. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R Wilner. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Pedro Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (ghap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2019: #2 Summons) (ghap). (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#9

(#9) Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lom) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lom) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07354 GW(MRWx). (rn) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Order forwarded to the District Judge. Re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 . (vm) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued as to defendant Capital One. re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 (vm) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (vm) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pedro Hernandez. (ghap) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Pedro Hernandez. (ghap) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants Capital One, Does 1-5. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R Wilner. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Pedro Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (ghap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2019: #2 Summons) (ghap). (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.