This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/18/2022 at 08:09:48 (UTC).

Pedersen v. Dearborn Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/17/2022 Pedersen filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Dearborn Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary Feinerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00884

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maren Pedersen

Defendant

Dearborn Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark D. DeBofsky

Attorney at DeBofsky, Sherman & Casciari, P.C.

150 N. Wacker Dr., Suite 1925

Chicago, IL 60606

William T. Reynolds, IV

Attorney at DeBofsky Sherman Casciari Reynolds, P.C.

150 N. Wacker Dr., Suite 1925

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorney

Eric P. Mathisen

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

56 S. Washington St., Suite 302

Valparaiso, IN 46383

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Maren Pedersen; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19168534. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeBofsky, Mark) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Maren Pedersen by Mark D. DeBofsky (DeBofsky, Mark) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (DeBofsky, Mark) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Maren Pedersen by William T. Reynolds, IV (Reynolds, William) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 4/22/2022 at 9:30 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 4/15/2022. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dearborn Life Insurance Company by Eric P. Mathisen (Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Dearborn Life Insurance Company (Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION by Defendant Dearborn Life Insurance Company for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maren Pedersen as to Dearborn Life Insurance Company on 4/8/2022, answer due 4/29/2022. (Reynolds, William) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to answer #8 is granted. The deadline for Defendant to file a responsive pleading is extended to 5/20/2022.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION by Defendant Dearborn Life Insurance Company to continue April 22, 2022 Initial Stratus Hearing (Joint Motion) (Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION by Defendant Dearborn Life Insurance Company to continue April 22, 2022 Initial Stratus Hearing (Joint Motion) (Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to answer #8 is granted. The deadline for Defendant to file a responsive pleading is extended to 5/20/2022.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maren Pedersen as to Dearborn Life Insurance Company on 4/8/2022, answer due 4/29/2022. (Reynolds, William) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Defendant Dearborn Life Insurance Company for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Dearborn Life Insurance Company (Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dearborn Life Insurance Company by Eric P. Mathisen (Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Dearborn Life Insurance Company. (ey, ) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Dearborn Life Insurance Company (jn, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 4/22/2022 at 9:30 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 4/15/2022. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ey, ) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ey, ) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Maren Pedersen by William T. Reynolds, IV (Reynolds, William) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (DeBofsky, Mark) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Maren Pedersen by Mark D. DeBofsky (DeBofsky, Mark) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Maren Pedersen; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19168534. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeBofsky, Mark) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dearborn Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric P. Mathisen