This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2020 at 07:39:21 (UTC).

Pebble Tide LLC v. PlainsCapital Bank

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 Pebble Tide LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against PlainsCapital Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01162

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pebble Tide LLC

Defendant

PlainsCapital Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

73 W. Monroe St.

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

D. Yoon Chae

Attorney at Baker McKenzie LLP

1900 North Pearl Street, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Benjamin Beckage Kelly

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie LLP

1900 North Pearl Street, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

John G. Flaim

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie LLP

1900 North Pearl Street, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by D. Yoon Chae. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by PlainsCapital Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by D. Yoon Chae ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13061139) by on behalf of PlainsCapital Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Benjamin) Modified on 1/21/2020 (td). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#10

(#10) Pro Hac Vice Letter to D. Yoon Chae. (td) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by PlainsCapital Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to PlainsCapital Bank. (cj) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#3

(#3) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Pebble Tide LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Main Document 3 replaced and flattened on 11/26/2019) (cj). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Pebble Tide LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 11/26/2019) (cj). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit Declaration of Inventor

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit Patent

1 #1

Exhibit Patent- Cert of Correction

#1

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by PlainsCapital Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by D. Yoon Chae. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: PlainsCapital Bank answer due 2/11/2020. (td) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #12 Unopposed Second Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant PlainsCapital Bank shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Pebble Tide, LLC's complaint, (Dkt. 1), on or before February 11, 2020.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by PlainsCapital Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by D. Yoon Chae ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13061139) by on behalf of PlainsCapital Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Benjamin) Modified on 1/21/2020 (td). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Pro Hac Vice Letter to D. Yoon Chae. (td) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: PlainsCapital Bank answer due 1/27/2020. (td) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #9 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant PlainsCapital Bank shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Pebble Tide, LLC's complaint, (Dkt. 1), on or before January 27, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by PlainsCapital Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to PlainsCapital Bank. (cj) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, along with a copy of the Complaint. (cj) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Pebble Tide LLC. (cj) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, by Pebble Tide LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pebble Tide LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Pebble Tide LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Main Document 4 replaced and flattened on 11/26/2019) (cj). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Pebble Tide LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Main Document 3 replaced and flattened on 11/26/2019) (cj). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Pebble Tide LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 11/26/2019) (cj). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12896349), filed by Pebble Tide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Patent- Cert of Correction, #2 Exhibit Patent, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Inventor)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEBBLE TIDE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PlainsCapital Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaac Philip Rabicoff