This case was last updated from PACER on 02/19/2020 at 07:08:54 (UTC).

Pebble Tide LLC v. Government Employees Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/21/2019 Pebble Tide LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Government Employees Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01236

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pebble Tide LLC

Defendant

Government Employees Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

73 W. Monroe St.

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Joelle P. Justus

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Matthew J. Moore

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Carolyn Homer

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joelle P. Justus for GEICO. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew J. Moore for GEICO. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pebble Tide LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 02/02/2020)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carolyn Homer for Matthew J. Moore ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13131387) by on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Homer, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Response to Complaint by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Homer, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carolyn Homer for Joelle P. Justus ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13125882) by on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Homer, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#8

No Description Available

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Pebble Tide LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/29/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Government Employees Insurance Company. (cj) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#5

(#5) Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, along with a copy of the Complaint. (cj) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pebble Tide LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/21/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Pebble Tide LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 12/23/2019) (cj). (Entered: 12/21/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joelle P. Justus for GEICO. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew J. Moore for GEICO. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pebble Tide LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 02/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carolyn Homer for Matthew J. Moore ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13131387) by on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Homer, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Government Employees Insurance Company answer due 2/26/2020. (dm) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by February 26, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ld) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Response to Complaint by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Homer, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carolyn Homer for Joelle P. Justus ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13125882) by on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Homer, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carolyn Homer on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Company. Attorney Carolyn Homer added to party Government Employees Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Homer, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Pebble Tide LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Government Employees Insurance Company. (cj) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, along with a copy of the Complaint. (cj) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Pebble Tide LLC. (cj) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Pebble Tide LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Main Document 4 replaced and flattened on 12/23/2019) (cj). (Entered: 12/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pebble Tide LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Pebble Tide LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 12/23/2019) (cj). (Entered: 12/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13004595), filed by Pebble Tide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Attachment 6 replaced and flattened on 12/23/2019) (cj). (Entered: 12/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEBBLE TIDE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaac Philip Rabicoff