This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/08/2019 at 08:25:46 (UTC).

Pebble Tide LLC v. Amcrest Industries LLC

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 Pebble Tide LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Amcrest Industries LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew S Hanen and Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03906

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Andrew S Hanen

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Pebble Tide LLC

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Amcrest Industries, LLC

Consolidated Defendant

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Phillip Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

73 W Monroe St

Arlington, VA 22209

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Michael R Ellis

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Neil J McNabnay

Attorney at Fish Richardson PC

1717 Main St, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Ricardo Joel Bonilla

Attorney at Fish and Richardson

1717 Main St, Ste 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Consolidated Defendant Attorney

Rose Cordero Prey

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - NY

200 Park Avenue, 38Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

#35

#34

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

22 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#22

#5

#4

#2

1 #7

Supplement Corporate Disclosure

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

#1

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) REPLY in Support of #22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT, filed by Amcrest Industries, LLC. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) NOTICE of Appearance by Ricardo J. Bonilla on behalf of Amcrest Industries, LLC, filed. (Bonilla, Ricardo) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER granting #30 Motion for Isaac Rabicoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff Pebble Tide LLC.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(hcarr, 4) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Neil J. McNabnay on behalf of Amcrest Industries, LLC, filed. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) RESPONSE in Opposition to Amcrest's Motion to Dismiss re: #22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT, filed by Pebble Tide LLC. (jdav, 4) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MOTION for Isaac Rabicoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Pebble Tide LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/14/2019. (jdav, 4) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Charles Eskridge, pursuant to Special Order No. 2019-4. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect, and all court settings are vacated. Judge Andrew S Hanen no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (NicoleDiaz, 4) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Case transferred in from Texas Eastern. Case Number 2:19-cv-00201; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Interdistrict transfer to the Southern District of Texas. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2019
  • Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amcrest Industries LLC to 8/23/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amcrest Industries LLC.( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amcrest Industries LLC to 7/24/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amcrest Industries LLC.( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Amcrest Industries LLC c/o SAWERA RAVAT. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Phillip Rabicoff on behalf of Pebble Tide LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Amcrest Industries LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7283757.), filed by Pebble Tide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplement Patent Report, #7 Supplement Corporate Disclosure)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where amcrest industries llc is a litigant

Latest cases where PEBBLE TIDE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael R. Ellis