This case was last updated from PACER on 03/04/2020 at 15:08:36 (UTC).

Pearson v. Macon County Sheriff's Department et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2019 Pearson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Macon County Sheriff's Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Colin Stirling Bruce and Eric I. Long. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02190

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

Referral Judge

Eric I. Long

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crystal Pearson

Defendants

Macon County Sheriff's Department

Unknown Macon County Sheriff Deputies

Macon County

Sheriff Antonio Brown

Hunt

Wolfe

City of Decatur

Currently Unknown Decatur Police Officer

Antonio Brown

. Marquis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shawn William Barnett

Attorney at HALE & MONICO LLC

Suite 330, 53 West Jackson

Chicago, IL 60604

Andrew MacDonald Hale

Attorney at HALE & MONICO, LLC

Suite 330, 53 West Jackson

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Susan Jacqueline Eberhardt

Attorney at KNIGHT HOPPE KURNIK & KNIGHT LTD

Suite 600, 5600 North River Road

Rosemont, IL 60018-5114

William W Kurnik

Attorney at KNIGHT HOPPE KURNIK & KNIGHT LTD

Suite 600, 5600 North River Road

Rosemont, IL 60018-5114

Michael J Atkus

Attorney at KNIGHT HOPPE KURNIK & KNIGHT LTD

Suite 600, 5600 North River Road

Rosemont, IL 60018-5114

Michael B Baggett

Attorney at MACON COUNTY STATES ATTORNEY

Macon County Bldg, 4Th Floor, 253 E Wood Street

Decatur, IL 62523

John T Robinson

Attorney at CITY OF DECATUR

1 Gary K Anderson Plaza

Decatur, IL 62523

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Decatur (Robinson, John) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#25

(#25) CERTIFICATE of Service (Amended). (Eberhardt, Susan) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#23

(#23) Minute Entry for proceedings held 11/13/2019 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Appearance for Plaintiffs by Shawn Barnett. Appearance for Defendants by Michael Atkus and John Robinson. Rule 16 conference held by telephone. Court notes the cases were consolidated for discovery. Plan approved excluding the response/reply to dispositive motion deadlines; dates set. Consent to magistrate judge discussed (form attached). ADR options offered, including court-hosted settlement conference. The following discovery deadlines are set: Long. Initial disclosure due by: 11/22/19; Amended pleadings due by: 12/13/19; Joinder of parties due by: 12/13/19; Plaintiff`s expert disclosure and expert reports due by: 6/12/20; Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by: 6/17/20; Defendant's expert disclosure and expert reports due by: 8/14/20; Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by: 9/18/20; Plaintiff disclosures regarding rebuttal experts due by 10/16/20; Plaintiffs rebuttal experts available for deposition by 11/20/20; Discovery, including deposition of experts, due by: 11/20/20; Case dispositive motions due by: 2/15/21. Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 4/26/2021 at 1:30 PM by personal appearance before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Selection/Jury Trial is scheduled for 5/11/2021 at 9:00 AM before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana, (7-10 days). Status Hearing set before Judge Long on 4/16/20 at 10:00 AM by telephone to discuss possible court hosted mediation or summary trial. (Tape #UR-B 10:02 AM.) (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael J Atkus on behalf of Antonio Brown, Hunt, Macon County, Macon County Sheriff's Department, Wolfe (Atkus, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#21

(#21) City of Decatur Defendants' ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by City of Decatur, Currently Unknown Decatur Police Officer.(Robinson, John) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#6

TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/8/2019. Defendants' Motion to Consolidate #6 is GRANTED. This case is consolidated for the purpose of discovery with 2:19-cv-2169, Jackson v. Macon County Sheriff's Department et al. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Antonio Brown, Macon County, Macon County Sheriff's Department. Antonio Brown waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Macon County waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Macon County Sheriff's Department waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Eberhardt, Susan) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Shawn William Barnett on behalf of Crystal Pearson (Barnett, Shawn) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3150874.), filed by Crystal Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnett, Shawn) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/3/2020. The Status Conference set for 4/30/20 is RESCHEDULED to 5/13/20 at 10:00 AM. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Response by City of Decatur re Order,, Set/Reset Hearings, . (Robinson, John) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/18/2020. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Status Conference set for 4/16/20 is RESCHEDULED to 4/30/20 at 10:00 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long.(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Decatur (Robinson, John) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Crystal Pearson.(Barnett, Shawn) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CERTIFICATE of Service (Amended). (Eberhardt, Susan) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Decatur, Currently Unknown Decatur Police Officer Decatur Defendants' Initial Disclosure (Robinson, John) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Minute Entry for proceedings held 11/13/2019 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Appearance for Plaintiffs by Shawn Barnett. Appearance for Defendants by Michael Atkus and John Robinson. Rule 16 conference held by telephone. Court notes the cases were consolidated for discovery. Plan approved excluding the response/reply to dispositive motion deadlines; dates set. Consent to magistrate judge discussed (form attached). ADR options offered, including court-hosted settlement conference. The following discovery deadlines are set: Long. Initial disclosure due by: 11/22/19; Amended pleadings due by: 12/13/19; Joinder of parties due by: 12/13/19; Plaintiff`s expert disclosure and expert reports due by: 6/12/20; Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by: 6/17/20; Defendant's expert disclosure and expert reports due by: 8/14/20; Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by: 9/18/20; Plaintiff disclosures regarding rebuttal experts due by 10/16/20; Plaintiffs rebuttal experts available for deposition by 11/20/20; Discovery, including deposition of experts, due by: 11/20/20; Case dispositive motions due by: 2/15/21. Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 4/26/2021 at 1:30 PM by personal appearance before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Selection/Jury Trial is scheduled for 5/11/2021 at 9:00 AM before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana, (7-10 days). Status Hearing set before Judge Long on 4/16/20 at 10:00 AM by telephone to discuss possible court hosted mediation or summary trial. (Tape #UR-B 10:02 AM.) (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael J Atkus on behalf of Antonio Brown, Hunt, Macon County, Macon County Sheriff's Department, Wolfe (Atkus, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) City of Decatur Defendants' ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by City of Decatur, Currently Unknown Decatur Police Officer.(Robinson, John) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/8/2019. Defendants' Motion to Consolidate #6 is GRANTED. This case is consolidated for the purpose of discovery with 2:19-cv-2169, Jackson v. Macon County Sheriff's Department et al. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Susan Jacqueline Eberhardt on behalf of Antonio Brown, Macon County, Macon County Sheriff's Department (Eberhardt, Susan) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/7/2019. On 8/6/19, Attorney Susan Eberhardt entered a Notice of Appearance #5 . The Notice of Appearance is signed by and includes the bar number of attorney William W. Kurnik. The Court directs the Clerk to strike docket entry #5 as entered in error and directs attorney Susan Eberhardt to enter a correct Notice of Appearance. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William W Kurnik on behalf of Antonio Brown, Macon County, Macon County Sheriff's Department (Kurnik, William) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Consolidate Cases [AGREED] by Defendants Antonio Brown, Macon County, Macon County Sheriff's Department. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Eberhardt, Susan) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) **STRICKEN**NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Susan Jacqueline Eberhardt on behalf of Antonio Brown, Macon County, Macon County Sheriff's Department (Eberhardt, Susan) Modified on 8/7/2019 to show stricken pursuant to the text order entered this date (DS, ilcd). (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Antonio Brown, Macon County, Macon County Sheriff's Department. Antonio Brown waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Macon County waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Macon County Sheriff's Department waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Eberhardt, Susan) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Andrew MacDonald Hale on behalf of Crystal Pearson (Hale, Andrew) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Shawn William Barnett on behalf of Crystal Pearson (Barnett, Shawn) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3150874.), filed by Crystal Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnett, Shawn) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.