This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:24:09 (UTC).

Pearson v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Pearson filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian A Tsuchida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01993

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian A Tsuchida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Danissa Kay Lewter Pearson

Defendants

Social Security Commissioner

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jaclyn J Gaddy

Attorney at RUSSELL & HILL PLLC

3811-A Broadway

Everett, WA 98201

Defendant Attorney

Kerry Jane Keefe

Attorney at US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (SEA)

700 Stewart St, Ste 5220

Seattle, WA 98101-1271

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. The Clerk shall issue summonses. (TF) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of Washington on 1/27/2020, filed by Plaintiff Danissa Kay Lewter Pearson. (Gaddy, Jaclyn) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (TF) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Danissa Kay Lewter Pearson.(TF) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. The Clerk shall issue summonses. (TF) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRAECIPE to attach document re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Danissa Kay Lewter Pearson (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Gaddy, Jaclyn) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida. (TF) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions.Corrected signature page must be filed by 12/23/2019. (CDA) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketHon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (CDA) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Danissa Kay Lewter Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaddy, Jaclyn) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PROPOSED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Social Security Commissioner, filed by Danissa Kay Lewter Pearson.(Gaddy, Jaclyn) (IFP Pending). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.