This case was last updated from PACER on 03/17/2019 at 07:55:01 (UTC).

Pearson et al v. Doe et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 Pearson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William M Ray, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00314

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M Ray, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Pearson

Sandra Pearson

Cross Claimant and Petitioner

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendants and Cross Defendants

John Doe

Dollar General Corporation

Werner Enterprises, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Gordon Hammill

Attorney at Kenneth S. Nugent, P.C. - Duluth

Building 11, Suite 300, 4227 Pleasant Hill Road

Duluth, GA 30096

Dexter J. Youmans

Attorney at Kenneth S. Nugent, P.C.

Suite 300, Building 11, 4227 Pleasant Hill Road

Duluth, GA 30096

Jan Phillip Cohen

Attorney at Kenneth S. Nugent, P.C. - Duluth

Building 11, Suite 300, 4227 Pleasant Hill Road

Duluth, GA 30096

Bradford Gregory Valentine

Attorney at Johnson Marlowe LLP

335B Oconee Street

Athens, GA 30601

Cross Claimant and Petitioner Attorneys

Stephanie V. Chavies

Attorney at Lynn Leonard & Assoc.

P.O. Box 29200, 2400 Century Pkwy., N.E., Suite 200

Atlanta, GA 30359

Scott Eric Anderson

Attorney at Lynn Leonard & Associates

Suite 200, 2400 Century Pkwy., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30345

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Erica L. Morton

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers, LLP

The Peachtree, Suite 300, 1355 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3231

Jordan Matthew Mahoney

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers, LLP

The Peachtree, Suite 300, 1355 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3231

Caitlin Dorne Mattler

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, P.C.-ATL

Suite 2900, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303-1775

Scott Harlan Moulton

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, P.C.-ATL

Suite 2900, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303-1775

Sean Cox

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, P.C.-ATL

Suite 2900, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303-1775

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Attachments A through C

#17

(#17) Initial Disclosures by Werner Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachments A through C)(Moulton, Scott) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford Gregory Valentine on behalf of David Pearson, Sandra Pearson (Valentine, Bradford) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Cox on behalf of Werner Enterprises, Inc. (Cox, Sean) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#14

(#14) Certificate of Interested Persons by Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Mattler, Caitlin) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Service of Subpoena To Produce Documents, Information or Objects by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Anderson, Scott) Modified on 3/1/2019 to edit text (bnp). (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#12

(#12) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 1, 2019 through April 5, 2019, April 8, 2019, April 9, 2019, May 3, 2019, May 6, 2019, May 7, 2019, July 3, 2019 through July 5, 2019, July 8, 2019, November 22, 2019, November 25, 2019 through November 29, 2019, by Scott Eric Anderson. (Anderson, Scott) Modified on 2/28/2019 to edit text (bnp). (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#11

(#11) Certificate of Interested Persons by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Anderson, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#7

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Attorney Stephanie V. Chavies re #7 Scheduling Order. (bnp) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#6

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #6 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 10/17/2019. Motions due by 11/18/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/18/2019. However, if a Motion for Summary Judgment is filed, the Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order will be due within 30 days of the Court's ruling on the Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are directed to adhere to the above deadlines. Any motions requesting extensions of time must be made prior to the existing deadline and will be granted only in exceptional cases. The Clerk is directed to submit this action on November 19, 2019, if the parties have not filed a Motion for Summary Judgment or Proposed Pretrial Order. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 2/14/2019. (bnp) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#5

Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons - OK per WMR (sll) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Initial Disclosures by Werner Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachments A through C)(Moulton, Scott) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford Gregory Valentine on behalf of David Pearson, Sandra Pearson (Valentine, Bradford) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Cox on behalf of Werner Enterprises, Inc. (Cox, Sean) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #14 Certificate of Interested Persons - OK per WMR (sll) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Certificate of Interested Persons by Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Mattler, Caitlin) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #12 Leave of Absence - Judge Ray will not require Attorney Anderson's presence during the following dates: April 1, 2019, April 2, 2019, April 3, 2019, April 4, 2019, April 5, 2019, April 8, 2019, April 9, 2019, May 3, 2019, May 6, 2019, May 7, 2019, July 3, 2019, July, 4, 2019, July 5, 2019, July 8, 2019, November 22, 2019, November 25, 2019, November 26, 2019, November 27, 2019, November 28, 2019, November 29, 2019. (sll) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Service of Subpoena To Produce Documents, Information or Objects by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Anderson, Scott) Modified on 3/1/2019 to edit text (bnp). (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 1, 2019 through April 5, 2019, April 8, 2019, April 9, 2019, May 3, 2019, May 6, 2019, May 7, 2019, July 3, 2019 through July 5, 2019, July 8, 2019, November 22, 2019, November 25, 2019 through November 29, 2019, by Scott Eric Anderson. (Anderson, Scott) Modified on 2/28/2019 to edit text (bnp). (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #11 Certificate of Interested Persons - OK per WMR (sll) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Certificate of Interested Persons by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Anderson, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Initial Disclosures by Dollar General Corporation.(Morton, Erica) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Attorney Stephanie V. Chavies re #7 Scheduling Order. (bnp) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #6 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 10/17/2019. Motions due by 11/18/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/18/2019. However, if a Motion for Summary Judgment is filed, the Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order will be due within 30 days of the Court's ruling on the Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are directed to adhere to the above deadlines. Any motions requesting extensions of time must be made prior to the existing deadline and will be granted only in exceptional cases. The Clerk is directed to submit this action on November 19, 2019, if the parties have not filed a Motion for Summary Judgment or Proposed Pretrial Order. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 2/14/2019. (bnp) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Dollar General Corporation. (Morton, Erica) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons - OK per WMR (sll) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interested Persons by Dollar General Corporation. (Morton, Erica) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand; and CROSSCLAIM against Dollar General Corporation, Werner Enterprises, Inc. and John Doe with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal). (eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Dollar General Corporation. Discovery ends on 6/17/2019. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Dollar General Corporation. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-8391180) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Plaintiffs Response to State Farm, #2 Exhibit -B -State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit -C -Dollar General's Answer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less