This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2020 at 01:40:12 (UTC).

Pearlshire Capital Group, LLC v. Zaid

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 Pearlshire Capital Group, LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Zaid. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia M. Kendall. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07095

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Kendall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pearlshire Capital Group, LLC

Defendant

Rana Rehan Zaid

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick D. Lamb

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney, P.C.

221 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 1550

Chicago, IL 60601-1206

John F. Sullivan

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney, P.C.

221 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 1550

Chicago, IL 60601

Matthew L. Hendricksen

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney, P.C.

221 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 1550

Chicago, IL 60601-1206

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Case is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #10 . Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pearlshire Capital Group, LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE BEFORE SERVICE OF ANSWER OR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Sullivan, John) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 1/15/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2020. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pearlshire Capital Group, LLC by John F. Sullivan John Sullivan (Sullivan, John) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pearlshire Capital Group, LLC by Matthew L. Hendricksen Matthew L. Hendricksen (Hendricksen, Matthew) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lma, ) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pearlshire Capital Group, LLC by Patrick D. Lamb Matthew L. Hendricksen (Lamb, Patrick) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pearlshire Capital Group, LLC by Patrick D. Lamb (Lamb, Patrick) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pearlshire Capital Group, LLC by Patrick D. Lamb (Lamb, Patrick) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lamb, Patrick) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Pearlshire Capital Group, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16383035.(Lamb, Patrick) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Case is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #10 . Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pearlshire Capital Group, LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE BEFORE SERVICE OF ANSWER OR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Sullivan, John) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 1/15/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2020. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pearlshire Capital Group, LLC by John F. Sullivan John Sullivan (Sullivan, John) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pearlshire Capital Group, LLC by Matthew L. Hendricksen Matthew L. Hendricksen (Hendricksen, Matthew) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lma, ) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Rana Rehan Zaid. (lw, ) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pearlshire Capital Group, LLC by Patrick D. Lamb Matthew L. Hendricksen (Lamb, Patrick) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pearlshire Capital Group, LLC by Patrick D. Lamb (Lamb, Patrick) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pearlshire Capital Group, LLC by Patrick D. Lamb (Lamb, Patrick) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lamb, Patrick) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Pearlshire Capital Group, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16383035.(Lamb, Patrick) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Francis Sullivan, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew L. Hendricksen