This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2021 at 08:34:05 (UTC).

Pearl IP Licensing LLC v. Thermal Care, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 Pearl IP Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Thermal Care, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01545

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pearl IP Licensing LLC

Defendant

Thermal Care, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Pazuniak

Attorney at O'Kelly & Ernst, LLC

824 N. Market Streetsuite 1001A

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Thermal Care, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3731851.) - filed by Pearl IP Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,819,539. (smg) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#4

(#4) Summonses Issued as to Thermal Care, Inc. (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (smg) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION to Extend Time - filed by Pearl IP Licensing LLC. (Pazuniak, George) Modified on 11/15/2021 (nms). (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Complaint to January 31, 2022 - filed by Pearl IP Licensing LLC. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Complaint to January 31, 2022 - filed by Pearl IP Licensing LLC. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Thermal Care, Inc. answer due 12/31/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/15/2021. (nms) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION to Extend Time - filed by Pearl IP Licensing LLC. (Pazuniak, George) Modified on 11/15/2021 (nms). (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summonses Issued as to Thermal Care, Inc. (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (smg) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,819,539. (smg) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Thermal Care, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3731851.) - filed by Pearl IP Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pearl IP Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George Pazuniak