This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/02/2022 at 07:53:43 (UTC).

Pearl IP Licensing LLC v. Makita USA Inc

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 Pearl IP Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Makita USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara M. G. Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01937

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara M. G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pearl IP Licensing LLC

Defendant

Makita USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Neal G Massand

Attorney at Ni Wang & Massand PLLC

8140 Walnut Hill Lane, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75231

Howard L Wernow

Attorney at Sand Sebolt & Wernow Co LPA

Aegis Tower- Suite 1100, 4940 Munson Street Nw

Canton, OH 44718

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Notice of Dismissal. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ykp) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Pearl IP Licensing LLC (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

11 #1

Proposed Order

11 #11

Main Document

9 #3

Proposed Order

9 #2

Exhibit(s) B-Courts of Admission

9 #1

Exhibit(s) A-Certificate of Good Standing

9 #9

Main Document

#7

(#7) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mlb) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/1/2022) (mlb). (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Pearl IP Licensing LLC. (mlb) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#5

(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mlb) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Pearl IP Licensing LLC. (Massand, Neal) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/1/2022 to flatten pdf) (mlb). (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of A0120 filed by Pearl IP Licensing LLC (Massand, Neal) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pearl IP Licensing LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Massand, Neal) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/1/2022 to flatten pdf) (mlb). (Entered: 09/01/2022)

1 #3

Cover Sheet Supplement Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s) Exhibit B

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Notice of Dismissal. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ykp) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per #13 NOTICE of Dismissal. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (ykp) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Pearl IP Licensing LLC (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Makita U.S.A., Inc. to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. The deadline for Defendant Makita U.S.A., Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is December 12, 2022. (Ordered by District Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/24/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Agreed MOTION to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Makita USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Brandy Shannell Nolan added to party Makita USA Inc(pty:dft) (Nolan, Brandy) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Howard L. Wernow. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by District Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/13/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13104204) filed by Pearl IP Licensing LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit(s) B-Courts of Admission, #3 Proposed Order) (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC ORDER: It has come to the Court's attention that Plaintiff's counsel Howard Wernow is not admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Within 14 days from the date of this Order, Howard Wernow must either become admitted to practice in this District (see Local Rule 83.7) or move the Court to be admitted Pro Hac Vice (see Local Rule 83.9(b)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/6/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mlb) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/1/2022) (mlb). (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Pearl IP Licensing LLC. (mlb) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mlb) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Pearl IP Licensing LLC. (Massand, Neal) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/1/2022 to flatten pdf) (mlb). (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of A0120 filed by Pearl IP Licensing LLC (Massand, Neal) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pearl IP Licensing LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Massand, Neal) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/1/2022 to flatten pdf) (mlb). (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Makita USA Inc filed by Pearl IP Licensing LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-13082995) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement Civil Cover Sheet) (Massand, Neal) (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/1/2022 to flatten pdf) (mlb). (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pearl IP Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MAKITA U.S.A. LNC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neal Massand

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard L. Wernow