This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2022 at 08:50:56 (UTC).

Peanuts Worldwide LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 Peanuts Worldwide LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Robert Blakey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06170

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peanuts Worldwide LLC

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

lovelybuy

Nantong Cake Textile Technology Co., Ltd.

Dongguan Gemfits Technology Co., Ltd.

Zhuji Haoxin Trading Co., Ltd.

Fuzhou Smart Artifact Co., Limited

Yantai Light Inflatable Co., Ltd.

Fujian Maotai Crafts Co.,ltd.

Zhejiang Quayee Trade Co., Ltd.

Shanghai Jiacai Digital Technology Co., Ltd.

Shenzhen Shengjun Trading Co., Ltd.

Shenzhen Guanhong Technology Co., Ltd.

Shenzhen Heng Yi Xin Gift Co., Ltd.

Suzhou Qicai Niwa Cultural Creative

Shenzhen Zhongcheng Silicone Products Co., Ltd.

Union Chance Co., Ltd.

Yiwu Jingzhou Import & Export Co., Ltd.

JOINBEAUTY Official Store

iORRA Store

182 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr.Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Isaku Begert

Attorney at Greer, Burns And Crain, Ltd.

300 S Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drivesuite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Marcella Deshonda Slay

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 South Wacker Dr. Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorney

Xingyi Tao

Attorney at Chongqing Qianyu Law Firm

Xixia Rd No. 18, Yubei Dist

(Chinese Address, State Doesn'T Apply, ZI 401122

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the notices of voluntary dismissal #36 , #37 , this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to the following Defendants: lovelybuy (No. 97), jinnan (No. 146), Weijueqing (No. 151), Jinge Textile Store (No. 18), jinxinda115 (No. 72), and Sanowen (No. 167). Absent reinstatement by 10/14/22, this dismissal shall convert to a dismissal with prejudice as to these Defendants without further order. Mailed notice (mjc, ) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#41

(#41) NOTICE of Motion by Isaku Begert for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #38 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/18/2022 at 11:00 AM. (Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#40

(#40) DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #39 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

39 #1

Exhibit 1

#39

(#39) MEMORANDUM by Peanuts Worldwide LLC in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #38 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#38

(#38) MOTION by Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC for default judgment as to all Defendants (Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#37

(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Peanuts Worldwide LLC as to Certain Defendants (Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#36

(#36) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Peanuts Worldwide LLC as to certain defendants (Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#35

(#35) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 12/21/2021. Mailed notice(gel, ) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the notices of voluntary dismissal #36 , #37 , this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to the following Defendants: lovelybuy (No. 97), jinnan (No. 146), Weijueqing (No. 151), Jinge Textile Store (No. 18), jinxinda115 (No. 72), and Sanowen (No. 167). Absent reinstatement by 10/14/22, this dismissal shall convert to a dismissal with prejudice as to these Defendants without further order. Mailed notice (mjc, ) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Motion by Isaku Begert for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #38 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/18/2022 at 11:00 AM. (Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #39 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MEMORANDUM by Peanuts Worldwide LLC in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #38 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION by Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC for default judgment as to all Defendants (Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Peanuts Worldwide LLC as to Certain Defendants (Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Peanuts Worldwide LLC as to certain defendants (Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Nantong Cake Textile Technology Co., Ltd., Dongguan Gemfits Technology Co., Ltd., Zhuji Haoxin Trading Co., Ltd., Fuzhou Smart Artifact Co., Limited, Yantai Light Inflatable Co., Ltd., Fujian Maotai Crafts Co.,ltd., Zhejiang Quayee Trade Co., Ltd., Shanghai Jiacai Digital Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Shengjun Trading Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Guanhong Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Heng Yi Xin Gift Co., Ltd., Suzhou Qicai Niwa Cultural Creative, Shenzhen Zhongcheng Silicone Products Co., Ltd., Union Chance Co., Ltd., Yiwu Jingzhou Import & Export Co., Ltd., JOINBEAUTY Official Store, iORRA Store, Jinge Textile Store, NSN SOCK Store, Good store, JWEIJIAO Official Store, TAFREE Jewels Store, Hugnature Store, Disney-TAFREE Officiall Store, Shop3883033 Store, MoonPianoOutlet Store, DaiShana Official Store, YOU ARE BUTIFUL Store, Give We Five Store, Stinky socks not stinky Store, JEBMQ Store, Trendy socks Store, Professional Customize Your Life Store, Factory discount shop can be customized Store, Cadillon Global Dropshipping Store, Decor Town Store, Design Your Life Store, Stickers Emotions Store, Have-fun Store, AHLJWSMILE Store, Mkeia Factory Store, MENILITHS Intimates Cloths Store, Sanofi-aventis da Store, Happie DAY Store, XuBaby Store, Dravens Store, Missions Sense Store, cy toy store Store, Rice grains A Store, Shenzhen Ivanhoe Product Technology Development Co., Ltd., Shenzhen City Yangyu Trading Company Limited, hsfghfgs, fanmengxiaodian, xiangchengshifenxuanshangmaoyouxiangongsi, HongfuStore, zhuangzhuangbaihuo, Sparkling electricity, LiZhiBaoFu, liyouping, A1ALOA130JGLKI, September department store, JNSH-US, GuangZhouQingQiangBingYiLiaoYouXianGongSi, ShanXiZhiChengDianZiShangWuYouXianGongSi, AlELCJY, HCCVBGE, ROSEASTAR001, Mars Melit Center, liuyixinrui, dong fang qu fang shi ri yong bai huo dian, uiksdshatoy, jinxinda115, Yuan-Shop, Yufei Xue666, wenyuan baihuo, A1TRCYF76M6T7R, zhangqSHOP, Hey Flight Store, Taotanxi, wang2007, TOTOTXL, A1VKJK2UVSS6QA, FSGHJUU, jiaoxiangwangluokejiyouxiangongsi, JuNuo-home, DOUJU, LMRLETB, SaroLa, shuke., lingyibaihuo, shuoyanxin, zhangyingUSA, MiLan998, LIANGRUSM, xiaonuomi, Jinhuan Qiu, DTKMKG, Dingxueping_Clothes 7-15 Days Delivery, Vannan fumitaka biotech co, GJ-MYH, xiayixianyuningshangmao, Xianshusiruanjiankejiyouxian, langleizhijia, YANGPENGP, YuanSi-, lianghang1, CMZUSSHOP, w2018, yuhangznb, wangfengshopshop, A2NVG76WEVWTCL, FanFuShangMao1, Hong FA 1, YI BO TE, DFZstore, xinweilong, xiaoxuejia, liuyun19960216, Chen Yu's shop, Liang-Shop, JHMYSH, tianhuabanbaihuo, xiangchengshishengmingshangmaoyouxiangongsi, Juguang, YEXINKEJI, US Christmas Gifts Brand, BanWoJiaJu, gdutan, LIUER, Quality goods us, xiaoyangdianpu, dongwl3, wangyuxin-us, A3GP89WMML1JIZ, shijiazhuangbojiandianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, yuyuyueyue, hubeizhonglin, LIXIAOXI, A3JF41Z03RA682, bailudianpu, A3LFM7QYRFA9EV, Coersd(7-15 Day Delivery), YMshopshop, mokongdianzishangwubu, jinnan, GuoFei Chen, pangduan, Happ Life, LvLiangShiLiShiQuLaoRenWuJinRiZaDianpu, Weijueqing, xiang cheng shi zhi shang shang mao you xian gong, Mood story, jiehang2, Brown Matthew, LIANGYUANSHANGPU, ScharnhorstSchlachtkreuzer, Merry Christmas Brand 1966, Highway shop, yangguchuyi, shuoerkeji, ZHHShop, NLLZL, linghengyue, shisuyi-us, YunGangQuWeiLongErShouCheHang, Sanowen, hai shang yuan, zengxiaoling, pengleixi, changshichangdabai, AHVQQVRCDM07C, fgyryr, Luping, KuiCongshangmao, ningyamin811203, feifankeji, Tsorryen, Coffeemug Store, FaRui, AR2F23FWHX8HI, hangzhouyunhui, Xin Cheng Bai Huo Shang Hang, Hongteng Trading, lanshanquxuanboshipinjinxiaobu, ZDHSM, PLDMY, Xinhongxin-Z, MENGSHI, yuemiaoermao, xingyu&, yuanzhimin84, xufumei, qycq63shop, HEZHICHAO3850, shenzhenxifengdianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, zengjian999, weixiaofangxi, Simple Solutions 33 and zhouyanan4117 added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 12/21/2021. Mailed notice(gel, ) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: In person motion hearing held on 12/21/2021. No defendant appeared or contacted Chambers regarding any scheduling conflicts. No defendant has filed an appearance in this matter or otherwise objected in response to the TRO or Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #30 . Accordingly, and based upon the same findings made in this Court's TRO #22 , this Court finds that a preliminary injunction is appropriate and warranted, as well as unopposed and grants Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #30 . Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The Court directs the Clerk to unseal any previously sealed documents in this matter. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to add all defendants listed on Schedule A to the Court's docket within three business days. Plaintiff may find instructions at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. By 1/27/22, Plaintiff shall file a status report regarding the status of service of process, settlement discussions, and any further information that Plaintiff wishes to bring to the Court's attention. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA (bg, ) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (sxh, ) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, ) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC by Isaku Begert (Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Peanuts Worldwide LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18888081. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peanuts Worldwide LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant