This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 08:28:13 (UTC).

Peachtree Pilot Supply, LLC v. Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Peachtree Pilot Supply, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles F. Eick and Stephen V. Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09767

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEACHTREE PILOT SUPPLY, LLC

Defendant

ADVANCED PURIFICATION ENGINEERING CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ben T Lila

Attorney at Mandour and Associates APC

8605 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Joseph A Mandour, III

Attorney at Mandour and Associates APC

8605 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Defendant Attorney

David E Libman

Attorney at Law Office of David Libman APC

2041 North Main Street Suite A

Santa Ana, CA 92706

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David E Libman counsel for Defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation. Adding David E. Libman, Esq., LL.M. as counsel of record for Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation. (Libman, David) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#16

(#16) ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 2/8/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation #11 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Answer and/or Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Motion to Dismiss on file. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#14

(#14) DISCLOSURE of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #12 filed by Defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation (Libman, David) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#13

(#13) First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David E Libman on behalf of Defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation (Libman, David) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation.(Attorney David E Libman added to party Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation(pty:dft))(Libman, David) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#11

(#11) APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation filed by plaintiff Peachtree Pilot Supply, LLC. (Lila, Ben) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Peachtree Pilot Supply, LLC, upon Defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation served on 11/11/2020, answer due 12/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kenny Tseng, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lila, Ben) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#9

(#9) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation. (esa) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff PEACHTREE PILOT SUPPLY, LLC. (Lila, Ben) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by PEACHTREE PILOT SUPPLY, LLC. (Lila, Ben) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff PEACHTREE PILOT SUPPLY, LLC, (Lila, Ben) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff PEACHTREE PILOT SUPPLY, LLC. (Lila, Ben) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-28686668 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff PEACHTREE PILOT SUPPLY, LLC. (Attorney Ben T Lila added to party PEACHTREE PILOT SUPPLY, LLC(pty:pla))(Lila, Ben) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David E Libman counsel for Defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation. Adding David E. Libman, Esq., LL.M. as counsel of record for Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation. (Libman, David) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 2/8/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation #11 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Answer and/or Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Motion to Dismiss on file. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DISCLOSURE of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #12 filed by Defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation (Libman, David) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David E Libman on behalf of Defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation (Libman, David) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation.(Attorney David E Libman added to party Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation(pty:dft))(Libman, David) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation filed by plaintiff Peachtree Pilot Supply, LLC. (Lila, Ben) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Peachtree Pilot Supply, LLC, upon Defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation served on 11/11/2020, answer due 12/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kenny Tseng, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lila, Ben) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Advanced Purification Engineering Corporation. (esa) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff PEACHTREE PILOT SUPPLY, LLC. (Lila, Ben) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by PEACHTREE PILOT SUPPLY, LLC. (Lila, Ben) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff PEACHTREE PILOT SUPPLY, LLC, (Lila, Ben) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff PEACHTREE PILOT SUPPLY, LLC. (Lila, Ben) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-28686668 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff PEACHTREE PILOT SUPPLY, LLC. (Attorney Ben T Lila added to party PEACHTREE PILOT SUPPLY, LLC(pty:pla))(Lila, Ben) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less