This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/31/2021 at 08:35:01 (UTC).

PEACE v. METRIC ENGINEERING INC et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 PEACE filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against METRIC ENGINEERING INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T KENT WETHERELL II and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00137

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T KENT WETHERELL II

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Adrian Peace, Sr.

ADRIAN PEACE, SR

Defendants

METRIC ENGINEERING, INC.

METRIC ENGINEERING INC

THOMPSON TRUCKING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ERIKA ESAN GOODMAN

Attorney at MARIE A MATTOX PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

203 North Gadsden Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

MARIE A MATTOX

Attorney at MARIE A MATTOX PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

203 North Gadsden Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorneys

B TYLER WHITE

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS LLP - JACKSONVILLE FL

501 Riverside Ave Ste 902

Jacksonville, FL 32202

MARY MEGAN COUGHLIN

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS LLP - JACKSONVILLE FL

501 Riverside Ave Ste 902

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#6

#5

#4

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADRIAN PEACE, SR. THOMPSON TRUCKING LLC served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #19 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Discovery due by 4/4/2022. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/2 /2022. Mediation to take place by 4/25/2022. Mediation Report due by 5/2/2022.) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 8/19/2021. (alb) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Summons Issued as to THOMPSON TRUCKING LLC. (alb) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (COUGHLIN, MARY) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Summonses to be Issued by Clerk by ADRIAN PEACE, SR re #16 Amended Complaint (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER re #15 Consent MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint to Correct Defendant. The motion is GRANTED, and the second amended complaint (Doc. #16 ) is now the operative complaint. Defendant Metric Engineering, Inc. shall have 14 days from the date of this Order to answer or otherwise respond to the second amended complaint. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). Defendant Thompson Consulting Services, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the second amended complaint within the time prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(1). METRIC ENGINEERING INC answer due 9/1/2021; THOMPSON TRUCKING LLC answer due 9/1/2021. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 8/18/2021. (alb) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #16 Amended Complaint, #15 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Leave to Amend Complaint to Correct Defendant. (alb) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by ADRIAN PEACE, SR. (GOODMAN, ERIKA) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Leave to Amend Complaint to Correct Defendant by ADRIAN PEACE, SR. (GOODMAN, ERIKA) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIKA ESAN GOODMAN on behalf of ADRIAN PEACE, SR (GOODMAN, ERIKA) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ADRIAN PEACE, SR. (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #3 Scheduling Order. Each non-governmental corporate party must file a statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. The deadline for filing the statement is set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, and, if not filed sooner, the statement must in any event be filed within 14 days of the date of the scheduling order. The deadline expired on 7/20/2021. A corporate disclosure statement must be filed for Thompson Trucking, no later than 7/27/2021. Clerk to notify chambers on 7/27/2021. (alb) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings re #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/23/2021). (alb) (Entered: 07/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by METRIC ENGINEERING, INC.. (COUGHLIN, MARY) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by METRIC ENGINEERING, INC.. (COUGHLIN, MARY) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MARY MEGAN COUGHLIN on behalf of METRIC ENGINEERING, INC. (COUGHLIN, MARY) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/20/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/19/2021. Discovery due by 11/3/2021. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 7/6/2021. (alb) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of RemovaL. (Please see proposed ISO.) (alb) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket(#2) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by METRIC ENGINEERING, INC. from Fourteenth Judicial Circuit, Jackson County, FL, case number 2021-CA-0739685. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6165247.), filed by METRIC ENGINEERING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (WHITE, B) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THOMPSON TRUCKING COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Metric Engineering, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERIKA ESAN GOODMAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARIE A MATTOX