This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2020 at 08:07:53 (UTC).

PDTW, LLC v. Richard Peddie et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 PDTW, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Richard Peddie. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Patrick J. Walsh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01740

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Patrick J. Walsh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PDTW, LLC

Defendants

David Schnider

Joseph Foster

KF Professionals

Law Office of David Schnider

Eniluz Gonzalez

Kyu Hong Kim, CPA, Inc.

Allyson Thompson

Stephen Choi

Steve Prestemon

Kyu HOng Kim

Kenneth Chung

Jene Park

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

Dimitrios Peter Biller

Attorney at LDT Consulting

906 Kagawa Street, Paficia Palisades

Los Angeles, CA 90272

 

Court Documents

#58

#57

#56

#55

#54

#51

#26

#23

20 #7

Exhibit

1 #20

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #16

Exhibit

1 #15

Exhibit

1 #11

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

106 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #56 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed - under Category - Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A HEARING DATE FOR A MANDATORY AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT BE SET AND CONSOLIDATED WITH A TRIAL ON THE MERITS REGARDING THOSE ISSUES (DKT. #23 ); PLAINTIFFS [PROPOSED] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND TO CONSOLIDATE A TRIAL ON THE ISSUES (DKT. #26 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: For the reasons stated in this Order, the Application and the Proposed Motion are DENIED; provided, however, that this denial is without prejudice to renewal of the Proposed Motion in accordance with the terms of this Order. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE filed by PDTW, LLC PDTW, LLC. Regarding Service of Notices of Acknowledgment & Receipt (Biller, Dimitrios) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) DECLARATION of Dimitrios P. Biller re First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Order Show Cause Why Hearing for Preliminary Injunction Should not be set #23 filed by Plaintiff PDTW, LLC. (Biller, Dimitrios) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff PDTW, LLC. correcting Request for Judicial Notice #51 (Biller, Dimitrios) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING ASIDE ORDER TO STRIKE REVISED AMENDED COMPLAINT (DKT. #19 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. In the interest of judicial economy, the Court agrees to accept the Revised Amended Complaint, and sets aside the Order to Strike (Dkt. #21 ). Furthermore, the Court orders the Clerk to correct the docket text for the "Amended Complaint" at Dkt. #20 to correctly identify the filing as Exhibits to the Revised Amended Complaint. The parties are notified that the operative complaint consists of Dkt. #19 and Dkt. #20 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) DECLARATION of Dimitrios P. Biller re First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Order Show Cause Why Hearing for Preliminary Injunction Should not be set #23 Supplemental Decl. of Biller filed by Plaintiff PDTW, LLC. (Biller, Dimitrios) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Order Show Cause Why Hearing for Preliminary Injunction Should not be set #23 filed by Plaintiff PDTW, LLC. (Biller, Dimitrios) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff PDTW, LLC. correcting Exhibit (non-trial) #46 Exhibits 109 (Part 2) and 122 (Biller, Dimitrios) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff PDTW, LLC. Exhibit 113 through 121 as to First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Order Show Cause Why Hearing for Preliminary Injunction Should not be set #23 . (Biller, Dimitrios) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PDTW, LLC PDTW, LLC. (Biller, Dimitrios) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by PDTW, LLC PDTW, LLC. (Biller, Dimitrios) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 20 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (lh) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (lh) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by PDTW PDTW, LLC. (Biller, Dimitrios) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-25481338 - Fee: $400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Dimitrios Peter Biller added to party PDTW, LLC(pty:bkmov))(Biller, Dimitrios) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KYU HONG KIM, CPA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PDTW, LLC is a litigant