This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/05/2019 at 07:34:41 (UTC).

PCM Sales, Inc. v. Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 PCM Sales, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael H. Watson and Elizabeth Preston Deavers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00795

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael H. Watson

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PCM Sales, Inc.

Defendants

Gina V. Johnson

Kathleen Phipps

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Faith Clair Whittaker

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP

255 East Fifth St., Ste 1900

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Nita Lorene Hanson

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP

191 West Nationwide Blvd., Suite 300

Columbus, OH 43215

Katie M. Connolly

Attorney at Nilan Johnson Lewis PA

120 South 6Th Street, Suite 400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick C. Keeley

Attorney at Piccione Keeley & Associates

122C South County Farm Road

Wheaton, IL 60187

Thomas Andrew Jackson

Attorney at Piccione Keeley & Associates

122C South County Farm Road

Wheaton, IL 60187

Anthony J. Martucci

65 East State Street, Suite 1400

Columbus, OH 43215

Marc J Kessler

Attorney at Hahn Loeser & Parks - 2

65 E State Street, 14Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215-4224

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) ORDER granting #21 Motion to Take Deposition from Mark Hamm. Defendants shall have SEVEN (7) DAYS after the date the deposition in which to file their Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 16). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on May 3, 2019. (jlk) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#24

(#24) AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff PCM Sales, Inc.. (Connolly, Katie) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/3/2019 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#21

(#21) MOTION to Take Deposition from Mark Hamm and Stay Defendants' Time to File a Reply Memorandum by Defendants Gina V. Johnson, Kathleen Phipps. (Kessler, Marc) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

20 #1

Affidavit

#20

(#20) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff PCM Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Connolly, Katie) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

16 #2

Exhibit Declaration of Kathleen Phipps

16 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Gina V. Johnson

#16

(#20) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff PCM Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Connolly, Katie) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Gina V. Johnson and Kathleen Phipps. (ew) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. on Kathleen Phipps (Hanson, Nita) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#2

(#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. on Gina V. Johnson (Hanson, Nita) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit Phipps Amendment

1 #4

Exhibit Phipps Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit Phipps Offer Letter

1 #2

Exhibit Phipps Contract

1 #1

Exhibit Johnson Contract

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6825860), filed by PCM Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Johnson Contract, #2 Exhibit Phipps Contract, #3 Exhibit Phipps Offer Letter, #4 Exhibit Phipps Agreement, #5 Exhibit Phipps Amendment) (Hanson, Nita) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Status Conference held on 5/3/2019. (sln) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER granting #21 Motion to Take Deposition from Mark Hamm. Defendants shall have SEVEN (7) DAYS after the date the deposition in which to file their Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 16). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on May 3, 2019. (jlk) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff PCM Sales, Inc.. (Connolly, Katie) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/3/2019 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • (#22) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Status Conference held on 5/1/2019. Plaintiff to submit a supplemental declaration for Mr. Hamm. The Court will reconvene the parties on May 3, 2019 at 10:00 AM. (sln) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION to Take Deposition from Mark Hamm and Stay Defendants' Time to File a Reply Memorandum by Defendants Gina V. Johnson, Kathleen Phipps. (Kessler, Marc) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff PCM Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Connolly, Katie) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 4/19/19. (jk) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Watson: Telephone Conference held on 4/18/2019. (Court Reporter: Allison Kimmel) (jk) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • NOTICE of Hearing - Telephone Status Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Michael H. Watson. Counsel shall call 888.684.8852; access code 3470668#. (jk) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs PCM Sales, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent PCM, Inc. (Hanson, Nita) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (ew). (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • NOTICE of Hearing - Telephone Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Michael H. Watson. Counsel are to call 888.684.8852, access code 3470668#. (jk) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Martucci for Defendants Gina V. Johnson, Kathleen Phipps (Martucci, Anthony) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc J Kessler for Defendants Gina V. Johnson, Kathleen Phipps (Kessler, Marc) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff PCM Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Declaration of Reginald Ellis, #2 Appendix Declaration of Katie Connolly) (Hanson, Nita) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by Plaintiff PCM Sales, Inc. Civil Cover Sheet (Hanson, Nita) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Gina V. Johnson and Kathleen Phipps. (ew) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. on Kathleen Phipps (Hanson, Nita) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. on Gina V. Johnson (Hanson, Nita) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6825860), filed by PCM Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Johnson Contract, #2 Exhibit Phipps Contract, #3 Exhibit Phipps Offer Letter, #4 Exhibit Phipps Agreement, #5 Exhibit Phipps Amendment) (Hanson, Nita) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PCM SALES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nita Lorene Hanson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katie M Connolly

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Faith C. Whittaker - PHV