Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2020 at 08:04:23 (UTC).

(PC)Dilbert v. CDCR et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 PC Dilbert filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against CDCR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeremy D. Peterson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00655

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeremy D. Peterson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clifford Alan Dilbert

Chowchilla, CA 93610-0092

Defendants

R. Fisher

CDCR

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 7/1/2020. Consent or Decline due by 8/3/2020 (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#6

(#6) FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against CDCR, R. Fisher by Clifford Alan Dilbert.(Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

5 #1

IFP Motion

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

3 #2

E-Filing Notice

3 #1

Consent Form

#3

(#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *5/11/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 6/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Clifford Alan Dilbert. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) (1983)PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Clifford Alan Dilbert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Clifford Alan Dilbert. (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 7/1/2020. Consent or Decline due by 8/3/2020 (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against CDCR, R. Fisher by Clifford Alan Dilbert.(Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Clifford Alan Dilbert. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docket(#4) DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: New Case Documents served on Valley State Prison. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *5/11/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 6/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Clifford Alan Dilbert. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) (1983)PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Clifford Alan Dilbert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CDCR is a litigant