This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 08:05:21 (UTC).

(PC) Perryman v. Director, CDCR et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 PC Perryman filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Director, CDCR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Deborah Barnes and John A. Mendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02480

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

Presiding Judge

John A. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Perryman

Represa, CA 95671-0066

Defendants

Supervisor

Director, CDCR

K. Lynch

Gavin Newsom

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by David Perryman. (York, M) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

3 #1

Order re Consent

#2

(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by David Perryman. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/20/2020 ORDERING Clerk to randomly assign a district judge to this case; DENYING Request in #1 Complaint for Appointment of Counsel; and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

3 #2

E-Filing Notice

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/5/2020 GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time; GRANTING Plaintiff 60 days from the date of this order in which to file his objections; and ORDERING Office of the CA Attorney General to contact the CSP-Sac Litigation Coordinator to determine what, if any, access plaintiff currently has to pen fillers or other writing implements and file and serve a statement reflecting the findings of such inquiry, including all appropriate declarations, within 15 days after the filing date of this order. (cc: Monica Anderson, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#3

(#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *12/11/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 1/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION for 60-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME and MOTION for Writing Supplies by David Perryman. (Attachments: #1 Notice re Mail Confirmation)(Huang, H) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

9 #1

Notice re Mail Confirmation

#7

(#7) MOTION for 60-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME and MOTION for Writing Supplies by David Perryman. (Huang, H) Modified on 2/4/2020 (Plummer, M). (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#1

(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by David Perryman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for 60-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME and MOTION for Writing Supplies by David Perryman. (Attachments: #1 Notice re Mail Confirmation)(Huang, H) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on David Perryman. (Henshaw, R) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/5/2020 GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time; GRANTING Plaintiff 60 days from the date of this order in which to file his objections; and ORDERING Office of the CA Attorney General to contact the CSP-Sac Litigation Coordinator to determine what, if any, access plaintiff currently has to pen fillers or other writing implements and file and serve a statement reflecting the findings of such inquiry, including all appropriate declarations, within 15 days after the filing date of this order. (cc: Monica Anderson, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for 60-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME and MOTION for Writing Supplies by David Perryman. (Huang, H) Modified on 2/4/2020 (Plummer, M). (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on David Perryman. (Henshaw, R) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/20/2020 ORDERING Clerk to randomly assign a district judge to this case; DENYING Request in #1 Complaint for Appointment of Counsel; and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-2480 JAM DB (PC). (Henshaw, R) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by David Perryman. (York, M) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for David Perryman, CDCR# AB-1204 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on David Perryman. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *12/11/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 1/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by David Perryman. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by David Perryman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.