This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:27:13 (UTC).

PC) Moulten v. Jakubowski

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by PC Moulten against Jakubowski in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01617

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Kendall J. Newman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew Moulten

Defendant

Marine Jakubowski

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/26/2019 GRANTING #2 and #6 Motions to Proceed IFP and DISMISSING #1 Complaint with leave to amend within 30 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350. All fees to be collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the CDCR filed concurrently herewith. (Henshaw, R) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Matthew Moulten. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Marine Jakubowski by Matthew Moulten. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tupolo, A) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

3 #1

Order re Consent

#8

(#8) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/26/2019 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Matthew Moulten. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

3 #2

E-Filing Notice

#5

(#5) CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Matthew Moulten. (Coll, A) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Matthew Moulten. (Coll, A) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#3

(#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *8/21/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 9/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#9

(#9) DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MAIL RETURNED as Refused; unable to forward: #8 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, sent to Matthew Moulten. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order and #8 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Matthew Moulten. (Henshaw, R) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/26/2019 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Matthew Moulten. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/26/2019 GRANTING #2 and #6 Motions to Proceed IFP and DISMISSING #1 Complaint with leave to amend within 30 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350. All fees to be collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the CDCR filed concurrently herewith. (Henshaw, R) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Matthew Moulten. (Coll, A) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Matthew Moulten. (Coll, A) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#4) CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Matthew Moulten, CDC G-59155 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Matthew Moulten. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *8/21/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 9/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Matthew Moulten. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Marine Jakubowski by Matthew Moulten. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tupolo, A) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.