This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 07:27:59 (UTC).

(PC) Kocak v. Jiminez

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 PC Kocak filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Jiminez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon S. Tigar and PSLC CHC. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04794

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

Referral Judge

PSLC CHC

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Ivan Kocak

Chowchilla, CA 93610

Defendant

Sherwin Jiminez

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from the Eastern District of California, Case No. 1:20cv00921BAM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00921. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the Northern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/2/2020. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by John Ivan Kocak. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against John Ivan Kocak by John Ivan Kocak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from the Eastern District of California, Case No. 1:20cv00921BAM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00921. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on John Ivan Kocak. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the Northern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/2/2020. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketBAM1 FLAG SET. (Wong, C) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docket***STAFF NOTE: Emailed BAM Chambers regarding venue. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by John Ivan Kocak. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against John Ivan Kocak by John Ivan Kocak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less