This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:58:47 (UTC).

(PC) Hicks v. Davis et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 PC Hicks filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Davis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carolyn K. Delaney and Morrison C. England, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02424

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Carolyn K. Delaney

Presiding Judge

Morrison C. England, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael J. Hicks

San Diego, CA 92179

Defendants

Mark Davis

Salahuddin Abdur-Rahman

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Salahuddin Abdur-Rahman, Mark Davis by Michael J. Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to RJ Donovan Correctional Facility, 480 Alta Road, San Diego, CA 92179 by Michael J. Hicks. (York, M) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

2 #1

Order re Consent

2 #2

E-Filing Notice

#4

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Michael J. Hicks. (Coll, A) Modified on 12/17/2019 (Plummer, M). (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#2

(#2) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *12/4/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 1/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/09/19 ORDERING Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the required fees in the amount of $400.00. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Plummer, M) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to RJ Donovan Correctional Facility, 480 Alta Road, San Diego, CA 92179 by Michael J. Hicks. (York, M) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Michael J. Hicks. (Coll, A) Modified on 12/17/2019 (Plummer, M). (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Michael J. Hicks. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • (#5) CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-02424-MCE-CKD. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, and prisoner IFP form served on Michael J. Hicks. (Plummer, M) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/09/19 ORDERING Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the required fees in the amount of $400.00. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Plummer, M) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY EMAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Michael J. Hicks. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *12/4/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 1/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Salahuddin Abdur-Rahman, Mark Davis by Michael J. Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.