Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2021 at 09:35:08 (UTC).

(PC) Grant v. County of Sacramento

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 PC Grant filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against County of Sacramento. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeremy D. Peterson and Kimberly J. Mueller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00628

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jeremy D. Peterson

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lawrence Grant

Elk Grove, CA 95757

Lawrence Terrell Grant

Elk Grove, CA 95757

Defendants

County of Sacramento

Medical Staff

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/10/2021 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Lawrence Terrell Grant. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: Financial Department) (Henshaw, R) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/7/2021 GRANTING plaintiff's #2 application to proceed ifp; DIRECTING the Clerk to randomly assign a judge to this action; and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice due to plaintiff's failure to exhaust prison administrative remedies before commencing this action. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#4

RESTRICTED

3 #1

Litigant Letter

#3

(#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Lawrence Grant. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#1

(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against County of Sacramento by Lawrence Grant.(Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Not In Custody: #5 Order and Findings and Recommendations sent to Lawrence Terrell Grant. Notice of Change of Address due by 8/2/2021. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, NIC: #6 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, sent to Lawrence Terrell Grant. Notice of Change of Address due by 7/29/2021. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Lawrence Terrell Grant. #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and #6 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Sheriff of Sacramento County, Attention: Inmate Trust Account, 651 I Street, Sacramento, California 95814. (Henshaw, R) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/10/2021 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Lawrence Terrell Grant. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: Financial Department) (Henshaw, R) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, Findings and Recommendations served on Lawrence Terrell Grant. (Yin, K) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/7/2021 GRANTING plaintiff's #2 application to proceed ifp; DIRECTING the Clerk to randomly assign a judge to this action; and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice due to plaintiff's failure to exhaust prison administrative remedies before commencing this action. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Lawrence Grant. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Lawrence Grant. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against County of Sacramento by Lawrence Grant.(Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDICAL STAFF is a litigant