This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2020 at 10:23:09 (UTC).

(PC) Warr v. Cates

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 PC Warr filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Cates. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stanley A. Boone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01091

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley A. Boone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Calvin Warr

Tehachapi, CA 93581

Defendant

Cates

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Amended Complaint Form

#7

(#7) ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Signature, Directing Clerk to Send Plaintiff a Blank Civil Rights Complaint Form, and Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

6 #1

IFP Motion

#6

(#6) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Calvin Warr. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

3 #1

IFP App & Instructions

#3

(#3) ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis OR Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP App & Instructions)(Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

2 #1

Consent Form

#2

(#2) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#1

(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Cates by Calvin Warr.(Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order served on Calvin Warr. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Signature, Directing Clerk to Send Plaintiff a Blank Civil Rights Complaint Form, and Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Calvin Warr. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Calvin Warr. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, served on Calvin Warr. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis OR Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP App & Instructions)(Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Calvin Warr. (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Cates by Calvin Warr.(Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less