This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/30/2022 at 07:13:36 (UTC).

(PC) Ackerson v. Elliott et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 PC Ackerson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Elliott. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kendall J. Newman and William B. Shubb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02205

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kendall J. Newman

Presiding Judge

William B. Shubb

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elton Ackerson

Susanville, CA 96127-3030

Defendants

Elliott

Hill

Azevedo

Arcineda

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Arcineda, Azevedo, Elliott, Hill by Elton Ackerson. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION to PETITION due to Violation of Procedure by Elton Ackerson. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Litigant Letter

#4

(#4) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/9/2021 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the required fees in the amount of $402.00. The Clerk shall send plaintiff an ifp application. (Yin, K) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/25/2022 ORDERING the Clerk to assign a district judge to this case and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order, Findings and Recommendations served on Elton Ackerson. (Yin, K) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/25/2022 ORDERING the Clerk to assign a district judge to this case and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, RTS: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider sent to Elton Ackerson. Notice of Change of Address due by 2/25/2022. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and ifp form served on Elton Ackerson. (Yin, K) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/9/2021 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the required fees in the amount of $402.00. The Clerk shall send plaintiff an ifp application. (Yin, K) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider re-served on Elton Ackerson at HDSP (address on #2 motion and confirmed with CDCR locator. (Yin, K) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Elton Ackerson. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to PETITION due to Violation of Procedure by Elton Ackerson. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Arcineda, Azevedo, Elliott, Hill by Elton Ackerson. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AZEVEDO is a litigant

Latest cases where ELLIOTT COMPANY AKA ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hill is a litigant