This case was last updated from PACER on 12/16/2019 at 08:03:23 (UTC).

PBS, LLC v. Gonzales Home 2 Lodging, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 PBS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gonzales Home 2 Lodging, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah S. Vance and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13170

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah S. Vance

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PBS, LLC

Defendants

Gonzales Home 2 Lodging, LLC

Hammond Lodging, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alex B Rothenberg

Attorney at Gordon, Arata, Montgomery & Barnett (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., 40Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170-4000

Phillip J. Antis, Jr.

Attorney at Gordon, Arata, Montgomery & Barnett (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., 40Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170-4000

Kristina Marie Lagasse

Attorney at Gordon, Arata, Montgomery & Barnett (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., 40Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170-4000

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Gonzales Home 2 Lodging, LLC on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Rothenberg, Alex) Modified text on 12/10/2019 (mm). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit 3

#3

(#3) DEFICIENT: WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Gonzales Home 2 Lodging, LLC on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Rothenberg, Alex) Modified text/answer due date on 12/10/2019 (mm). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Hammond Lodging, LLC on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Rothenberg, Alex) Modified text on 12/10/2019 (mm). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #1

Affidavit of Harish Pattni

#4

(#4) DEFICIENT: WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Hammond Lodging, LLC on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Rothenberg, Alex) Modified text/answer due date on 12/10/2019 (mm). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Gonzales Home 2 Lodging, LLC, Hammond Lodging, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7908953) filed by PBS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Harish Pattni, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibi Attorney Alex B Rothenberg added to party PBS, LLC(pty:pla).(Rothenberg, Alex) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Hammond Lodging, LLC on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Rothenberg, Alex) Modified text on 12/10/2019 (mm). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Gonzales Home 2 Lodging, LLC on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Rothenberg, Alex) Modified text on 12/10/2019 (mm). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEFICIENT: WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Hammond Lodging, LLC on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Rothenberg, Alex) Modified text/answer due date on 12/10/2019 (mm). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DEFICIENT: WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Gonzales Home 2 Lodging, LLC on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Rothenberg, Alex) Modified text/answer due date on 12/10/2019 (mm). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Gonzales Home 2 Lodging, LLC, Hammond Lodging, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7908953) filed by PBS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Harish Pattni, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibi Attorney Alex B Rothenberg added to party PBS, LLC(pty:pla).(Rothenberg, Alex) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.