This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2022 at 08:10:57 (UTC).

Paz et al v. The Chefs' Warehouse Midwest, LLC, a/k/a The Chefs' Warehouse Mid-West LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 Paz filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against The Chefs' Warehouse Midwest, LLC, a/k/a The Chefs' Warehouse Mid-West LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon Johnson Coleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06786

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon Johnson Coleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fernando Paz

Armando Bermudez

Andres S. Irizarry

Jesse Soto

Defendants

The Chefs' Warehouse Midwest, LLC, a/k/a The Chefs' Warehouse Mid-West LLC

Michael Stanley, individually

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel David Engelson

Attorney at Billhorn Law Firm

53 W. Jackson Blvd., Suite 840

Chicago, IL 60604

John William Billhorn

Attorney at Billhorn Law Firm

53 West Jackson Blvd., Suite 840

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

JeeHyun Yoon

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth

550 South Hope Street, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Julia Y. Trankiem

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

550 South Hope Street, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Woodley Brenna

Attorney at Riley Safer Holmes and Cancila LLP

70 W Madison St.

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE by Michael Stanley, individually, The Chefs' Warehouse Midwest, LLC, a/k/a The Chefs' Warehouse Mid-West LLC NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED RULE 6(b) MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND (Trankiem, Julia) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

12 #1

Certificate of Service

#12

(#12) STATUS Report Parties' Joint Initial Status Report by Armando Bermudez, Andres S. Irizarry, Fernando Paz, Jesse Soto (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19169826. (Yoon, JeeHyun) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION by Defendants Michael Stanley, individually, The Chefs' Warehouse Midwest, LLC, a/k/a The Chefs' Warehouse Mid-West LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of motion #9 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED RULE 6(b) MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND (Trankiem, Julia) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Motion by Julia Y. Trankiem for presentment of before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/22/2022 at 08:45 AM. (Trankiem, Julia) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michael Stanley, individually, The Chefs' Warehouse Midwest, LLC, a/k/a The Chefs' Warehouse Mid-West LLC by Julia Y. Trankiem (Trankiem, Julia) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michael Stanley, individually, The Chefs' Warehouse Midwest, LLC, a/k/a The Chefs' Warehouse Mid-West LLC by Woodley Brenna (Brenna, Woodley) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

6 #2

Waiver of Service Executed - Michael Stanley

6 #1

Waiver of Service Executed - The Chefs' Warehouse Midwest, LLC

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jesse Soto, Fernando Paz, Andres S. Irizarry, Armando Bermudez. Michael Stanley, individually waiver sent on 12/23/2021, answer due 2/21/2022; The Chefs' Warehouse Midwest, LLC, a/k/a The Chefs' Warehouse Mid-West LLC waiver sent on 12/23/2021, answer due 2/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Executed - The Chefs' Warehouse Midwest, LLC, #2 Waiver of Service Executed - Michael Stanley)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Telephone status hearing is set for 2/22/2022 at 9:45 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Armando Bermudez, Andres S. Irizarry, Fernando Paz, Jesse Soto by Samuel David Engelson (Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Armando Bermudez, Andres S. Irizarry, Fernando Paz, Jesse Soto by John William Billhorn (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

1 #4

Jesse Soto -Plaintiff Consent

1 #1

Fernando Paz - Plaintiff Consent

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FERNANDO PAZ, ARMANDO BERMUDEZ, ANDRES S. IRIZARRY, and JESSE SOTO, on behalf of themselves and all other plaintiffs similarly situated, known and unknown, v. THE CHEFS' WAREHOUSE MIDWEST, LLC, a/k/a THE CHEFS' WAREHOUSE MID-WEST LLC, and MICHAEL STANLEY, individually filed by Jesse Soto, Fernando Paz, Andres S. Irizarry, Armando Bermudez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18989066. (Attachments: #1 Fernando Paz - Plaintiff Consent, #2 Armando Bermudez - Plaintiff Consent, #3 Andres S. Irizarry - Plaintiff Consent, #4 Jesse Soto -Plaintiff Consent)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by Michael Stanley, individually, The Chefs' Warehouse Midwest, LLC, a/k/a The Chefs' Warehouse Mid-West LLC NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED RULE 6(b) MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND (Trankiem, Julia) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STATUS Report Parties' Joint Initial Status Report by Armando Bermudez, Andres S. Irizarry, Fernando Paz, Jesse Soto (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19169826. (Yoon, JeeHyun) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Defendants Michael Stanley, individually, The Chefs' Warehouse Midwest, LLC, a/k/a The Chefs' Warehouse Mid-West LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of motion #9 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED RULE 6(b) MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND (Trankiem, Julia) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Motion by Julia Y. Trankiem for presentment of before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/22/2022 at 08:45 AM. (Trankiem, Julia) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michael Stanley, individually, The Chefs' Warehouse Midwest, LLC, a/k/a The Chefs' Warehouse Mid-West LLC by Julia Y. Trankiem (Trankiem, Julia) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michael Stanley, individually, The Chefs' Warehouse Midwest, LLC, a/k/a The Chefs' Warehouse Mid-West LLC by Woodley Brenna (Brenna, Woodley) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jesse Soto, Fernando Paz, Andres S. Irizarry, Armando Bermudez. Michael Stanley, individually waiver sent on 12/23/2021, answer due 2/21/2022; The Chefs' Warehouse Midwest, LLC, a/k/a The Chefs' Warehouse Mid-West LLC waiver sent on 12/23/2021, answer due 2/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Executed - The Chefs' Warehouse Midwest, LLC, #2 Waiver of Service Executed - Michael Stanley)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Telephone status hearing is set for 2/22/2022 at 9:45 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ak, ) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, ) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Armando Bermudez, Andres S. Irizarry, Fernando Paz, Jesse Soto by Samuel David Engelson (Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Armando Bermudez, Andres S. Irizarry, Fernando Paz, Jesse Soto by John William Billhorn (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FERNANDO PAZ, ARMANDO BERMUDEZ, ANDRES S. IRIZARRY, and JESSE SOTO, on behalf of themselves and all other plaintiffs similarly situated, known and unknown, v. THE CHEFS' WAREHOUSE MIDWEST, LLC, a/k/a THE CHEFS' WAREHOUSE MID-WEST LLC, and MICHAEL STANLEY, individually filed by Jesse Soto, Fernando Paz, Andres S. Irizarry, Armando Bermudez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18989066. (Attachments: #1 Fernando Paz - Plaintiff Consent, #2 Armando Bermudez - Plaintiff Consent, #3 Andres S. Irizarry - Plaintiff Consent, #4 Jesse Soto -Plaintiff Consent)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julia Yenha Trankiem

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JeeHyun Yoon