This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2020 at 07:26:06 (UTC).

Payne v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 Payne filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration Commissioner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark E. Ford and P. K. Holmes III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02149

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark E. Ford

Presiding Judge

P. K. Holmes III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carl J Payne

Defendant

Social Security Administration Commissioner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David K. Harp

Attorney at Walker, Shock, Cox & Harp, PLLC

P.O. Box 998, 400 North 6Th Street

Fort Smith, AR 72902

Defendant Attorney

Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas

Attorney at OGCSSAR4

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl J Payne. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Atty Gen, #2 Summons Returned Off of Reg Chief Counsel)(Harp, David) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to U. S. Attorney, Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Attorney General of US for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Office of Reg Chief Counsel, #2 US Atty)(Harp, David) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable P. K. Holmes III and Honorable Mark E. Ford, as the referral judge. (Request for Reassignment filed 11/26/19.) (mjm) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 2, 2019. (cla) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for entry of the final judgment or order by Carl J Payne. (Harp, David) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Service, MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carl J Payne. (Harp, David) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(mjm) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Carl J Payne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harp, David) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Carl J Payne. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mjm) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less