This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/14/2019 at 07:40:26 (UTC).

Payne v. Monsanto Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 Payne filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John McBryde. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00400

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John McBryde

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robert E Payne

Robert Payne

Defendants

Bayer AG

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tom A Carse

Attorney at Carse Law Firm

6220 Campbell Road, Suite 401

Dallas, TX 75248

Kim Nicole Jones

Attorney at Simpson, Simpson & Penepacker

1119 Halsell Street

Bridgeport, TX 76426

Maryssa Jane Simpson

Attorney at Potts Law Firm, LLP

2911 Turtle Creek Blvd., Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75219

Michael Alan Simpson

Attorney at Simpson Simpson & Penepacker

1119 Halsell Street

Bridgeport, TX 76426

Timothy M Dortch

Attorney at Potts Law Firm LLP

2911 Turtle Creek Blvd, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Conditional Transfer Order 137: The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2741, and that order has now been filed in the Northern District of California. (bdb) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bayer AG, served on 5/22/2019; Monsanto Company, served on 5/22/2019. (tln) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

7 #2

Additional Page(s)

7 #1

Additional Page(s)

#7

(#7) Judge McBryde's paper original and copy of #3 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice (Other), #1 Complaint, filed by Robert Payne received pursuant to standing order. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s)) (bdb) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Monsanto Company. (bdb) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#5

(#5) Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/15/2019) (bdb) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robert E Payne. (Jones, Kim) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Related Case 4:19-cv-00400 filed by Robert E Payne (Jones, Kim) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

1 #1

Cover Sheet Plaintiff's Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Robert E Payne. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9988897) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Plaintiff's Civil Cover Sheet) (Jones, Kim) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • Case transferred from NDTX has been opened in California Northern District as case number 3:19-cv-3567. (bdb) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Interdistrict Transfer to Northern District of California; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in Northern District of California. (bdb) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Conditional Transfer Order 137: The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2741, and that order has now been filed in the Northern District of California. (bdb) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bayer AG, served on 5/22/2019; Monsanto Company, served on 5/22/2019. (tln) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Judge McBryde's paper original and copy of #3 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice (Other), #1 Complaint, filed by Robert Payne received pursuant to standing order. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s)) (bdb) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Monsanto Company. (bdb) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/15/2019) (bdb) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robert E Payne. (Jones, Kim) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Related Case 4:19-cv-00400 filed by Robert E Payne (Jones, Kim) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Robert E Payne. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9988897) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Plaintiff's Civil Cover Sheet) (Jones, Kim) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bayer AG is a litigant

Latest cases where Monsanto Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kim Nicole Jones

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Alan Simpson