This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/01/2022 at 08:21:36 (UTC).

Payne v. JJLH of Cumberland Valley, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/31/2022 Payne filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against JJLH of Cumberland Valley, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvette Kane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00162

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvette Kane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jodie Payne

Defendant

JJLH of Cumberland Valley, LLC doing business as Faulkner Volkswagen of Mechanicburg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin D. Salvina

Attorney at Murphy Law Group, LLC

1628 Jfk Blvd., Ste 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael P Murphy

Attorney at Murphy Law Group, LLC

1628 John F. Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 1803

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JJLH of Cumberland Valley, LLC ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5833163), filed by Jodie Payne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to JJLH of Cumberland Valley, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

2 #1

Summons Packet

#3

(#3) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/1/22. (dmn) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P Murphy on behalf of Jodie Payne (Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jodie Payne. JJLH of Cumberland Valley, LLC waiver sent on 2/1/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jodie Payne. JJLH of Cumberland Valley, LLC waiver sent on 2/1/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P Murphy on behalf of Jodie Payne (Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/1/22. (dmn) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to JJLH of Cumberland Valley, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JJLH of Cumberland Valley, LLC ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5833163), filed by Jodie Payne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin D. Salvina

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.