This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/15/2022 at 07:36:35 (UTC).

Payne v. Faith et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 Payne filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Faith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin C. Carlson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00217

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin C. Carlson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joshua Isaac Payne

Frackville, PA 17932

Defendants

Walter Faith

B. Mason

L. White

Kuzo

Nevis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Nicole J. Boland

Attorney at Office of Attorney General

15Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17120

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Joshua Isaac Payne. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Handwritten Complaint)(lp) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

1 #1

Plaintiff's Handwritten Complaint

#2

(#2) CERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joshua Isaac Payne.(lp) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (lp) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#5

(#5) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (Attachments: #1 Instruction Sheet, #2 Fed & Local Rules) (lp) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

5 #1

Instruction Sheet

5 #2

Fed & Local Rules

#6

(#6) Order Granting Application to Proceed IFP / ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on February 14, 2022. (kjn) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#7

(#7) Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to Walter Faith, Kuzo, B. Mason, Nevis, L. White. Waiver of Service due by 3/16/2022. (kjn) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole J. Boland on behalf of Walter Faith, Kuzo, B. Mason, Nevis, L. White (Boland, Nicole) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Nevis, L. White, B. Mason, Walter Faith, Kuzo. (Boland, Nicole) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Nevis, L. White, B. Mason, Walter Faith, Kuzo. (Boland, Nicole) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole J. Boland on behalf of Walter Faith, Kuzo, B. Mason, Nevis, L. White (Boland, Nicole) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to Walter Faith, Kuzo, B. Mason, Nevis, L. White. Waiver of Service due by 3/16/2022. (kjn) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Granting Application to Proceed IFP / ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on February 14, 2022. (kjn) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (Attachments: #1 Instruction Sheet, #2 Fed & Local Rules) (lp) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (lp) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joshua Isaac Payne. (lp) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joshua Isaac Payne.(lp) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Joshua Isaac Payne. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Handwritten Complaint)(lp) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole J. Boland Esq.