This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:58:57 (UTC).

Payne v. BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Payne filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James C. Dever, III and Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00003

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

James C. Dever, III

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chevell Payne

Defendants

BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC

AT&T Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lisa Walker

Attorney at Lisa Walker, Attorney at Law PLLC

Po Box 1473

Knightdale, NC 27545

Defendant Attorney

Robert E. Thomas, Jr.

Attorney at AT&T Services, Inc. - Legal Department

One Cnn Center, Sw1432A

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiffs' Counsel Lisa Walker, Attorney at Law LLC at P. O. Box 1473, Knightdale, NC 27545 mailed via US Mail on January 6, 2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Remval

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet

#13

(#13) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Chevell Payne. (Walker, Lisa) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons And Complaint

#7

(#7) Letter from Clerk of Court to Plaintiff's Attorney regarding Text Order entered 1/7/2020. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #2

Supplement Attachment 2 - Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by AT&T Services, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (Thomas, Robert) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Financial Disclosure Statement by AT&T Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T, Inc. for AT&T Services, Inc.. (Thomas, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Lisa Walker on behalf of Chevell Payne. (Walker, Lisa) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/27/2020. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#11

(#11) Defendants' Amended ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by AT&T Services, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (Thomas, Robert) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#3

(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AT&T, Inc. for BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (Thomas, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AT&T Services, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC from Wake County Superior Court, case number 19-CV-016511. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5249488), filed by AT&T Services, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Attachment 2 - Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Summons And Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Remval) (Thomas, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Robert E. Thomas, Jr on behalf of AT&T Services, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (Thomas, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/15/2020. Motions due by 10/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 2/18/2020. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#10

(#10) Financial Disclosure Statement by Chevell Payne (Walker, Lisa) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before 3/11/2020. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/15/2020. Motions due by 10/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 2/18/2020. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Remark - Rule 26(f) Report referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. for the entry of a scheduling order. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Chevell Payne. (Walker, Lisa) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/27/2020. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Defendants' Amended ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by AT&T Services, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (Thomas, Robert) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Financial Disclosure Statement by Chevell Payne (Walker, Lisa) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Lisa Walker on behalf of Chevell Payne. (Walker, Lisa) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by AT&T Services, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (Thomas, Robert) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter from Clerk of Court to Plaintiff's Attorney regarding Text Order entered 1/7/2020. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this Case is reassigned to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle for all further proceedings. District Judge James C. Dever, III is no longer assigned to case All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 5:20-CV-3-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/7/2020. (Moore, P. ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiffs' Counsel Lisa Walker, Attorney at Law LLC at P. O. Box 1473, Knightdale, NC 27545 mailed via US Mail on January 6, 2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Robert E. Thomas, Jr on behalf of AT&T Services, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (Thomas, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AT&T, Inc. for BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (Thomas, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Financial Disclosure Statement by AT&T Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T, Inc. for AT&T Services, Inc.. (Thomas, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AT&T Services, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC from Wake County Superior Court, case number 19-CV-016511. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5249488), filed by AT&T Services, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Attachment 2 - Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Summons And Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Remval) (Thomas, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.