This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2021 at 08:00:01 (UTC).

Pavlov et al v. Hirshfeld

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 Pavlov filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Hirshfeld. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Leonie M. Brinkema and Ivan D. Davis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00573

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonie M. Brinkema

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hints, Inc.

Elan Pavlov

Defendant

Andrew Hirshfeld

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Himanshu Pandya

Defendant Attorney

Hugham Chan

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

RESTRICTED

#20

#19

#18

17 #7

Exhibit G

17 #2

Exhibit B

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

#8

7 #1

Notice of Suit

#7

#6

#5

#4

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A (Patent File History)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elan Pavlov, Hints, Inc.. All Defendants. (Pandya, Brian) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/4/2021, before Judge Leonie M. Brinkema, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2021.(Thomson, Anneliese) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by Andrew Hirshfeld of Response to Court's Inquiry (Chan, Hugham) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER: For the reasons stated in open court, to be further explained in a written opinion to be filed in the future, plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction [Dkt. No. 11] is GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that defendant immediately take all reasonable and necessary steps, and cause the issuance of all necessary papers, forms, and application data, to vacate the "considered withdrawn" declaration in the PCT/US19/061456 (the'456 application) and restore the status of that application to "pending"; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiffs, having satisfied all the factors required under Winter v. Nat. Res. Def. Council, Inc., 555 U.S. 7 (2008) for a preliminary injunction and there being no contest as to the Court having jurisdiction to resolve the motion, need not post bond. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/4/21. (yguy) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2021. Appearances of counsel. Pltfs #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order is argued and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Hints, Inc., Elan Pavlov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Pandya, Brian) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Opposition to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Andrew Hirshfeld. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Chan, Hugham) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDERED that defendant's opposition to Plaintiffs Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for a Preliminary Injunction ("Motion for TRO/PI") be filed by close of business Friday, May 28, 2021, not to exceed 25 pages, and plaintiffs reply brief be filed by close of business Wednesday June 2, 2021, not to exceed 15 pages, and it is further ORDERED that a hearing on plaintiffs Motion for TRO/PI will be held in person on Friday, June 4, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 700. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 5/19/2021. (lber) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Hugham Chan on behalf of Andrew Hirshfeld (Chan, Hugham) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons to Attorney General by Hints, Inc., Elan Pavlov. (Pandya, Brian) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Suit) (lber) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Hints, Inc.. (Pandya, Brian) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons (Corrected) by Hints, Inc., Elan Pavlov. (Pandya, Brian) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint, (Corrected) by Hints, Inc., Elan Pavlov. (Pandya, Brian) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Correction re 3 Financial Disclosure Statement, [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet, 2 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that document numbers [1-1,2,3] are incorrectly saved PDF fillable forms and have been removed. The filing user was directed to refile all documents. (lber) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (lber) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • Docket(#3) Document Removed - Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Hints, Inc.. (Pandya, Brian) Modified on 5/7/2021 (lber). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • Docket(#2) Document Removed - Proposed Summons by Hints, Inc., Elan Pavlov. (Pandya, Brian) Modified on 5/7/2021 (lber). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7773067.), filed by Elan Pavlov, Hints, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet(Document Removed), #2 Exhibit Exhibit A (Patent File History))(Pandya, Brian) Modified on 5/7/2021 (lber). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less