This case was last updated from PACER on 03/16/2020 at 09:01:19 (UTC).

Paulk v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 Paulk filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet F. King, Orinda D. Evans and Regina D Cannon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00242

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Janet F. King

Presiding Judges

Orinda D. Evans

Regina D Cannon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marcus Paulk

Defendant

Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dexter Wimbish

420 Country Club Drive

Griffin, GA 30223

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without payment of filing fees, service costs or any costs of court as it appears that Plaintiff is without sufficient funds to pay the fees and costs of this action and still provide for the necessities of life. Plaintiff will provide service on the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 1/17/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S Notification of Reassignment to US Magistrate Judge Pursuant to Standing Order 07-02 re: #7 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-00242-RDC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (bdb) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Marcus Paulk. (Wimbish, Dexter) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FILED IN ERROR-NOTICE by Marcus Paulk Notice to Proceed Before Magistrate (Wimbish, Dexter) Modified on 2/20/2020, incorrect entry and notice not complete (bdb). (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Honorable Regina D Cannon. Magistrate Judge Janet F. King no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-00242-ODE-RDC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (bdb) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration ONLY.(bdb) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Marcus Paulk Proposed Summons (Wimbish, Dexter) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketSummons not issued. Incomplete. (bdb) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT filed by Marcus Paulk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - SSI Brief, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without payment of filing fees, service costs or any costs of court as it appears that Plaintiff is without sufficient funds to pay the fees and costs of this action and still provide for the necessities of life. Plaintiff will provide service on the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 1/17/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of Complaint with #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (eop) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Janet F. King. (eop) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Marcus Paulk. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2Exhibit - SSI Brief, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Blank Summon(s)(eop) Modified text on 1/17/2020 (eop). (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.