This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 07:24:56 (UTC).

Paulino v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Paulino filed an Other - Agriculture Subsidy lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Allyne R. Ross and James R. Cho. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03863

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Agriculture Subsidy

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Allyne R. Ross

Referral Judge

James R. Cho

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christian Paulino d/b/a My Neighbors Grocery Store

Defendants

United States of America

Washington, DC 20530

United States Department of Agriculture

1320 Braddock Place, Room 5042

Alexandria, VA 22314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Victor J. Molina, Jr.

Attorney at Victor Molina, Jr, Esq.

930 Grand Concourse

Bronx, NY 10451

Benjamin Sharav

Attorney at Benjamin Sharav, Esq

930 Grand Concourse, Ste. 1A

Bronx, NY 10451

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER re #12 Stipulation to stay plaintiff's disqualification from the USDA's Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program while this litigation is pending by United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 7/19/2021 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION fully executed stipulation and proposed order to stay plaintiff's disqualification from the USDA's Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program while this litigation is pending by United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America (Olds, Dara) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

11 #2

Exhibit Proofs of Certified Mailing

11 #1

Exhibit Summonses

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#9

(#9) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

8 #1

Summons

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Christian Paulino (Sharav, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Victor J. Molina, Jr on behalf of Christian Paulino (aty to be noticed) (Molina, Victor) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Sharav on behalf of Christian Paulino (notification declined or already on case) (Sharav, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Christian Paulino (Sharav, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Christian Paulino (Sharav, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Christian Paulino (Sharav, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America filing fee $ 402, receipt number BNYEDC-14642414 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Christian Paulino. (Sharav, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER re #12 Stipulation to stay plaintiff's disqualification from the USDA's Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program while this litigation is pending by United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 7/19/2021 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION fully executed stipulation and proposed order to stay plaintiff's disqualification from the USDA's Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program while this litigation is pending by United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America (Olds, Dara) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christian Paulino. United States Department of Agriculture served on 7/14/2021, answer due 9/13/2021; United States of America served on 7/14/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summonses, #2 Exhibit Proofs of Certified Mailing) (Sharav, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Christian Paulino (Sharav, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Victor J. Molina, Jr on behalf of Christian Paulino (aty to be noticed) (Molina, Victor) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Sharav on behalf of Christian Paulino (notification declined or already on case) (Sharav, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Christian Paulino (Sharav, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Christian Paulino (Sharav, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Christian Paulino (Sharav, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America filing fee $ 402, receipt number BNYEDC-14642414 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Christian Paulino. (Sharav, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Sharav

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Victor Jose Molina, Jr