This case was last updated from PACER on 07/09/2021 at 08:09:42 (UTC).

Pauley v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Pauley filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is R. Brooke Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01272

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Brooke Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Pauley

Defendant

Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy M. Garvey

Attorney at McDermott Law LLC

4600 South Ulster Street, Suite 800

Denver, CO 80237

Shawn E. McDermott

Attorney at McDermott Law LLC

4600 South Ulster Street, Suite 800

Denver, CO 80237

Defendant Attorneys

Byrne Joseph Decker

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC-Portland

2 Monument Square, 7Th Floor

Portland, ME 04101

Cristin Jeanette Mack

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC-St. Louis

7700 Bonhomme Avenue, Souite 650

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Daniel Pauley. (Garvey, Timothy) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#11

(#11) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The All parties do not consent.. (Decker, Byrne) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Byrne Joseph Decker on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, TheAttorney Byrne Joseph Decker added to party Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The(pty:dft) (Decker, Byrne) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The.(Mack, Cristin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Mack, Cristin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The.. (Mack, Cristin) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Pauley. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021. (Garvey, Timothy) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11 May 2021. Consent Form due by 7/2/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/9/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shawn E. McDermott on behalf of Daniel PauleyAttorney Shawn E. McDermott added to party Daniel Pauley(pty:pla) (McDermott, Shawn) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2. Life Policy

1 #1

Exhibit 1. LTD Policy

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7860155)Attorney Timothy M. Garvey added to party Daniel Pauley(pty:pla), filed by Daniel Pauley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. LTD Policy, #2 Exhibit 2. Life Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Garvey, Timothy) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Daniel Pauley. (Garvey, Timothy) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #11 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-1272-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The All parties do not consent.. (Decker, Byrne) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Byrne Joseph Decker on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, TheAttorney Byrne Joseph Decker added to party Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The(pty:dft) (Decker, Byrne) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The.(Mack, Cristin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Mack, Cristin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The.. (Mack, Cristin) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Pauley. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021. (Garvey, Timothy) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11 May 2021. Consent Form due by 7/2/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/9/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shawn E. McDermott on behalf of Daniel PauleyAttorney Shawn E. McDermott added to party Daniel Pauley(pty:pla) (McDermott, Shawn) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7860155)Attorney Timothy M. Garvey added to party Daniel Pauley(pty:pla), filed by Daniel Pauley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. LTD Policy, #2 Exhibit 2. Life Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Garvey, Timothy) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lincoln National Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawn E. McDermott