This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2020 at 10:17:05 (UTC).

Paul v. USF Holland LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Paul filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against USF Holland LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdul K Kallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01030

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Abdul K Kallon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reuben Paul, Jr

Defendants

On-Site Fuel Service Inc

USF Holland LLC

HDI Global Insurance Company

Professional Truck and Trailer Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wyatt P Montgomery

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF DAVID M. COWAN, LLC

2020 Canyon, Ste. 150

Birmingham, AL 35216

David M Cowan

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DAVID M COWAN LLC

2020 Canyon Road, Suite 150

Vestavia Hills, AL 35216

Defendant Attorneys

Michael R Lunsford

Attorney at PORTERFIELD HARPER MILLS MOTLOW & IRELAND PA

22 Inverness Center Parkway, Suite 600, P O Box 530790

Birmingham, AL 35253-0790

Dennis Oscar Vann

Attorney at CARR ALLISON

100 Vestavia Parkway

Birmingham, AL 35216

Lea Richmond, IV

Attorney at CARR ALLISON PC

100 Vestavia Parkway, Suite 200

Birmingham, AL 35216

John S Johnson

Attorney at HAND ARENDALL HARRISON SALE LLC

1801 5Th Avenue North, Suite 400

Birmingham, AL 35203

James S Witcher, III

Attorney at HAND ARENDALL LLC

1801 5Th Avenue North, Suite 400

Birmingham, AL 35203

John C Webb, V

Attorney at LLOYD, GRAY, WHITEHEAD & MONROE, PC

2501 20Th Place South, Suite 300

Birmingham, AL 35223

Daniel Robert Pickett

Attorney at LLOYD GRAY WHITEHEAD & MONROE PC

2501 Twentieth Place South Ste 300

Birmingham, AL 35223

 

Court Documents

#8

#7

#6

5 #7

Exhibit 7

5 #6

Exhibit 6

5 #5

Exhibit 5

5 #4

Exhibit 4

5 #3

Exhibit 3

5 #2

Exhibit 2

5 #1

Exhibit 1

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Reuben Paul, Jr. (Cowan, David) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by HDI Global Insurance Company. (Witcher, James) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Stay- Accordingly, briefing and consideration of Defendant HDI Global Insurance Companys Motion to Dismiss, #2 , is STAYED pending the resolution of the Motion to Remand, #5 The Defendants responses to the Motion to Remand, #5 , are due on August 19, 2020, and Plaintiffs reply, if any, is due on August 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 08/12/2020. (AKD) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand by Reuben Paul, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Cowan, David) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Stay re #2 MOTION to Dismiss UNTIL SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION DECIDED by Reuben Paul, Jr. (Cowan, David) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING SCHEDULE-Before the court is Defendant HDI Global Insurance Companys Motion to Dismiss #2 . Plaintiffs response is due by August 18, 2020, defendants reply,if any, is due by August 24, 2020. The parties are reminded of the briefing schedule outlined in Appendix III attached hereto. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 08/07/2020. (AKD) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Dismiss by HDI Global Insurance Company. (Witcher, James) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3633025. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HDI Global Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2018-905054, filed by HDI Global Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(KEK). (Witcher, James) NDAL receipt# B4601107273 Modified on 7/21/2020 (MEB2). (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProfessional Truck and Trailer Inc Answer to second amended complaint filed 6/23/2020 (see Doc #1 , exhibit 1, pages 44-50); USF Holland LLC Answer to second amended complaint filed 6/25/2020 (see Doc #1 , exhibit 1, pages 55/64); On-Site Fuel Service Inc Answer to second amended complaint filed 7/10/2020 (see Doc #1 , exhibit 1, pages 74-82) (KEK) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketState court complaint filed 12/19/2018 (see Doc #1 , exhibit 1, pages 11-17); amended complaint filed 5/19/2020 (see Doc #1 , exhibit 1, pages 18-20); second amended complaint filed 6/15/2020 (see Doc #1 , exhibit 1, pages 2-10) (KEK) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HDI Global Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2018-905054, filed by HDI Global Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(KEK) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ON SITE FUEL SERVICE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where USF Holland Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant