This case was last updated from PACER on 09/11/2021 at 07:35:00 (UTC).

Paul T. Gordy v. County of Los Angeles

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 Paul T Gordy filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of Los Angeles. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jesus G. Bernal and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07091

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul T. Gordy

Anaheim, CA 92806

Defendants

County of Los Angeles

City of Los Angeles

The Judicial Council

Renita Turner

DOES 1-10, inclusive

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) INITIAL ORDER UPON FILING OF COMPLAINT upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. Plaintiff shall file the Proof(s) of Service showing proper service upon each defendant within 90 daysof filing the complaint, that is by December 1, 2021. [See document for details] (et) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

2 #2

RTurner

2 #1

County of Los Angeles

2 #2

Main Document

1 #1

CV71

1 #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL ORDER UPON FILING OF COMPLAINT upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. Plaintiff shall file the Proof(s) of Service showing proper service upon each defendant within 90 daysof filing the complaint, that is by December 1, 2021. [See document for details] (et) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendants City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles and The Judicial Council. (Attachments: #1 County of Los Angeles, #2 RTurner) (jtil) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Paul T. Gordy filed against Defendants City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles, The Judicial Council and Renita Turner. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early.(Filing fee $402 Paid.) (Attachments: #1 CV71) (jtil) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant