This case was last updated from PACER on 03/16/2020 at 08:48:34 (UTC).

Patton v. Lehmburg et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 Patton filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Lehmburg. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew W. Austin and Lee Yeakel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00052

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Andrew W. Austin

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald D. Patton

Del Valle, TX 78617

Defendants

Travis County Prosecutors Office

Rosemary Lehmburg

Travis County District Attorney's Office

David Escamilla

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Case Opening Letter mailed to Ronald D. Patton. (cj) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronald D. Patton. (td) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet and Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400 is DUE.), filed by Ronald D. Patton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Envelope)(cj) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronald D. Patton. (jv2) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronald D. Patton. (jv2) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Re-mailed Order of Dismissal #3 to Plaintiff's current address. (td) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronald D. Patton. (td) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Opening Letter mailed to Ronald D. Patton. (cj) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin. (cj) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400 is DUE.), filed by Ronald D. Patton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Envelope)(cj) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.