Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/16/2019 at 08:12:26 (UTC).

Patton v. Domo Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 Patton filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Domo Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale A. Kimball and Evelyn J. Furse. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00781

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Kimball

Referral Judge

Evelyn J. Furse

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jarrett Patton

Defendants

Dana Evan

Mark Gorenberg

Matthew R. Cohler

Domo Inc

Joshua G. James

Fraser Bullock

Glenn Solomon

Nehal Raj

Bruce Felt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. Scofield

Attorney at PETERS SCOFIELD

7430 Creek Rd Ste 303

Salt Lake City, UT 84093-6160

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory L. Watts

Attorney at WILSON SONSINI GOODRICH & ROSATI PC

701 Fifth Ave Ste 5100

Seattle, WA 98104

Ignacio E. Salceda

Attorney at WILSON SONSINI GOODRICH & ROSATI

650 Page Mill Rd

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

Gregory M. Saylin

Attorney at HOLLAND & HART LLP

222 S Main St Ste 2200

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Cory A. Talbot

Attorney at HOLLAND & HART LLP

222 S Main St Ste 2200

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #15 Stipulated Motion for Adjournment of Case Deadlines and Conference. All case deadlines and conferences, including those enumerated in ECF No. #6 , other than those deadlines that relate to any motion for the appointment and selection of lead Plaintiff and lead counsel, are adjourned until a lead Plaintiff and lead counsel are appointed. Within 14 days of appointment of lead Plaintiff and lead counsel, the parties should submit a proposed schedule for the Court's approval resetting the deadlines postponed by this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/2/2019. (eat) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#15

(#15) STIPULATION re #6 Order to Propose Schedule, Joint Stipulation for Adjournment of Case Deadlines and Conference by Fraser Bullock, Matthew R. Cohler, Domo Inc, Dana Evan, Bruce Felt, Mark Gorenberg, Joshua G. James, Nehal Raj, Glenn Solomon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Talbot, Cory) Modified by changing event type to motion to stay on 12/2/2019 (eat). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendants Fraser Bullock, Matthew R. Cohler, Domo Inc, Dana Evan, Bruce Felt, Mark Gorenberg, Joshua G. James, Nehal Raj, Glenn Solomon. (Talbot, Cory) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ignacio E. Salceda for Defendants. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utah's local rules from the court's web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/21/2019. (eat) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

12 #2

Text of Proposed Order

12 #1

Exhibit 1 - Application

#12

(#12) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ignacio E. Salceda , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3425272, filed by Defendants Fraser Bullock, Matthew R. Cohler, Domo Inc, Dana Evan, Bruce Felt, Mark Gorenberg, Joshua G. James, Nehal Raj, Glenn Solomon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Talbot, Cory) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory L. Watts for Defendants. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utah's local rules from the court's web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/21/2019. (eat) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#10

(#10) EXHIBITS filed by Fraser Bullock, Matthew R. Cohler, Domo Inc, Dana Evan, Bruce Felt, Mark Gorenberg, Joshua G. James, Nehal Raj, Glenn Solomon re #9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory L. Watts , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3425224,. (Talbot, Cory) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit 1 - Application

#9

(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory L. Watts , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3425224, filed by Defendants Fraser Bullock, Matthew R. Cohler, Domo Inc, Dana Evan, Bruce Felt, Mark Gorenberg, Joshua G. James, Nehal Raj, Glenn Solomon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application)(Talbot, Cory) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Cory A. Talbot on behalf of Fraser Bullock, Matthew R. Cohler, Domo Inc, Dana Evan, Bruce Felt, Mark Gorenberg, Joshua G. James, Nehal Raj, Glenn Solomon (Talbot, Cory) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M. Saylin on behalf of Fraser Bullock, Matthew R. Cohler, Domo Inc, Dana Evan, Bruce Felt, Mark Gorenberg, Joshua G. James, Nehal Raj, Glenn Solomon (Saylin, Gregory) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to Defendants in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/21/2019. (eat) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Patrick V. Dahlstrom, for Plaintiff Jarrett Patton. (nl) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman and J. Alexander Hood II, for Plaintiff Jarrett Patton. (nl) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT (Class Action) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3397300) filed by Jarrett Patton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Plaintiff's Certification Pursuant to Federal Securities Laws, #3 Supplement Supplement to Appendix-- Schedule A, List of Plaintiff's Purchases and Sales) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (Scofield, David) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting #15 Stipulated Motion for Adjournment of Case Deadlines and Conference. All case deadlines and conferences, including those enumerated in ECF No. #6 , other than those deadlines that relate to any motion for the appointment and selection of lead Plaintiff and lead counsel, are adjourned until a lead Plaintiff and lead counsel are appointed. Within 14 days of appointment of lead Plaintiff and lead counsel, the parties should submit a proposed schedule for the Court's approval resetting the deadlines postponed by this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/2/2019. (eat) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION re #6 Order to Propose Schedule, Joint Stipulation for Adjournment of Case Deadlines and Conference by Fraser Bullock, Matthew R. Cohler, Domo Inc, Dana Evan, Bruce Felt, Mark Gorenberg, Joshua G. James, Nehal Raj, Glenn Solomon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Talbot, Cory) Modified by changing event type to motion to stay on 12/2/2019 (eat). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendants Fraser Bullock, Matthew R. Cohler, Domo Inc, Dana Evan, Bruce Felt, Mark Gorenberg, Joshua G. James, Nehal Raj, Glenn Solomon. (Talbot, Cory) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ignacio E. Salceda for Defendants. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utah's local rules from the court's web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/21/2019. (eat) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ignacio E. Salceda , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3425272, filed by Defendants Fraser Bullock, Matthew R. Cohler, Domo Inc, Dana Evan, Bruce Felt, Mark Gorenberg, Joshua G. James, Nehal Raj, Glenn Solomon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Talbot, Cory) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory L. Watts for Defendants. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utah's local rules from the court's web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/21/2019. (eat) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) EXHIBITS filed by Fraser Bullock, Matthew R. Cohler, Domo Inc, Dana Evan, Bruce Felt, Mark Gorenberg, Joshua G. James, Nehal Raj, Glenn Solomon re #9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory L. Watts , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3425224,. (Talbot, Cory) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory L. Watts , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3425224, filed by Defendants Fraser Bullock, Matthew R. Cohler, Domo Inc, Dana Evan, Bruce Felt, Mark Gorenberg, Joshua G. James, Nehal Raj, Glenn Solomon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application)(Talbot, Cory) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Cory A. Talbot on behalf of Fraser Bullock, Matthew R. Cohler, Domo Inc, Dana Evan, Bruce Felt, Mark Gorenberg, Joshua G. James, Nehal Raj, Glenn Solomon (Talbot, Cory) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M. Saylin on behalf of Fraser Bullock, Matthew R. Cohler, Domo Inc, Dana Evan, Bruce Felt, Mark Gorenberg, Joshua G. James, Nehal Raj, Glenn Solomon (Saylin, Gregory) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to Defendants in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/21/2019. (eat) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Patrick V. Dahlstrom, for Plaintiff Jarrett Patton. (nl) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman and J. Alexander Hood II, for Plaintiff Jarrett Patton. (nl) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • (#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 10/18/2019. (eat) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT (Class Action) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3397300) filed by Jarrett Patton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Plaintiff's Certification Pursuant to Federal Securities Laws, #3 Supplement Supplement to Appendix-- Schedule A, List of Plaintiff's Purchases and Sales) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (Scofield, David) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Plaintiff Jarrett Patton is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Domo Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. Scofield