Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/23/2019 at 08:20:40 (UTC).

Patton v. Blackburn et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 Patton filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Blackburn. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen K. Caldwell and P SO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00177

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

Referral Judge

P SO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Patton, Jr.

Pine Knot, KY 42635

Defendants

B. Asher

B. Blackburn

B. Messer

Kathy Miracle

Autumn Lawson

Adam Morrow

J. Posey

Carrie Cunnagin

D. Mullins

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER: 1. Patton's motion for an extension of time to pay his initial partial filing fee in this case [R. #18 ] is GRANTED. 2. Patton's initial partial filing fee is now due within 30 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 09/19/2019. (KJA)cc: COR, pro se filer via US Mail (Entered: 09/19/2019)

19 #1

Receipt

#19

(#19) Summons Issued as to B. Asher, B. Blackburn, Autumn Lawson, Kathy Miracle, D. Mullins, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service (MM) (MM). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2019: #1 Receipt) (MM). (Entered: 09/18/2019)

18 #1

Envelope - Postmarked 9/11/2019

#18

(#18) REQUEST for Extension of Time to pay initial filing fee by Richard Patton, Jr, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Postmarked 9/11/2019)(MM) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

17 #1

Envelope - Postmarked 9/11/2019

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Patton, Jr, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Postmarked 9/11/2019)(MM) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER: It is ORDERED as follows: 1. Patton's claims against Nurse Morrow, Dr. Cunnagin, Lieutenant Messer, and Lieutenant Posey are DISMISSED without prejudice. Thus, the Clerk's Office shall TERMINATE these defendants from this action. 2. That said, Patton may PROCEED on his claims against the remaining five defendants. 3. The Deputy Clerk shall prepare seven (7) "Service Packets" for service upon Lieutenant B. Blackburn, Lieutenant B. Asher, Nurse Kathy Miracle, Lieutenant D. Mullins, and Nurse Autumn Lawson, as well as the United States of America. 4. The Deputy Clerk shall send the Service Packets to the USMS in Lexington, Kentucky and note the date of delivery in the docket. 5. The USMS shall personally serve the five remaining defendants at the United States Penitentiary McCreary in Pine Knot, Kentucky, through arrangement with the Federal Bureau of Prisons. 6. The USMS shall serve the United States of America by sending one Service Packet by certified or registered mail to the Civil Process Clerk at the Office of the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Kentucky and another Service Packet by certified or registered mail to the Office of the Attorney General of the United States in Washington, D.C. 7. Patton must immediately advise the Clerks Office, in writing, of any change in his current mailing address. If Patton fails to do so, the Court will dismiss his case. 8. If Patton wishes to seek relief from this Court, he must do so by filing a formal motion with the Clerk's Office. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 09/16/2019.(KJA)cc: COR, pro se filer via US Mail (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE re: Administrative Remedies by Richard Patton, Jr, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Remedies, #2 Envelope - Postmarked 8-26-2019)(MM) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

6 #1

Envelope - Postmark illegible

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies by Richard Patton, Jr (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Postmark illegible)(MM) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

5 #1

Sample Caption Page

#5

(#5) IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(KJA) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#7) ORDER: 1. denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. 2. Clerk send Patton blank forms: a. AO 240; and b. EDKY 523. 3. W/I 30 days Patton pay fee or file forms. 4. If Patton fails to take steps, Court will dismiss. 5. Patton keep Clerk informed of mailing address. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/31/19. (SYD)cc: mailed w/forms to pro se filer (Entered: 07/31/2019)

1 #2

mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 07/23/2019

1 #1

Exhibit - BOP Health Services Clinical Encounter

#1

***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, #1 Complaint (Referred) (KJA) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER: 1. Patton's motion for an extension of time to pay his initial partial filing fee in this case [R. #18 ] is GRANTED. 2. Patton's initial partial filing fee is now due within 30 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 09/19/2019. (KJA)cc: COR, pro se filer via US Mail (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Summons Issued as to B. Asher, B. Blackburn, Autumn Lawson, Kathy Miracle, D. Mullins, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service (MM) (MM). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2019: #1 Receipt) (MM). (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #18 REQUEST for Extension of Time to pay initial filing fee by Richard Patton, Jr, pro se. (MM) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REQUEST for Extension of Time to pay initial filing fee by Richard Patton, Jr, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Postmarked 9/11/2019)(MM) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Patton, Jr, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Postmarked 9/11/2019)(MM) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER: It is ORDERED as follows: 1. Patton's claims against Nurse Morrow, Dr. Cunnagin, Lieutenant Messer, and Lieutenant Posey are DISMISSED without prejudice. Thus, the Clerk's Office shall TERMINATE these defendants from this action. 2. That said, Patton may PROCEED on his claims against the remaining five defendants. 3. The Deputy Clerk shall prepare seven (7) "Service Packets" for service upon Lieutenant B. Blackburn, Lieutenant B. Asher, Nurse Kathy Miracle, Lieutenant D. Mullins, and Nurse Autumn Lawson, as well as the United States of America. 4. The Deputy Clerk shall send the Service Packets to the USMS in Lexington, Kentucky and note the date of delivery in the docket. 5. The USMS shall personally serve the five remaining defendants at the United States Penitentiary McCreary in Pine Knot, Kentucky, through arrangement with the Federal Bureau of Prisons. 6. The USMS shall serve the United States of America by sending one Service Packet by certified or registered mail to the Civil Process Clerk at the Office of the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Kentucky and another Service Packet by certified or registered mail to the Office of the Attorney General of the United States in Washington, D.C. 7. Patton must immediately advise the Clerks Office, in writing, of any change in his current mailing address. If Patton fails to do so, the Court will dismiss his case. 8. If Patton wishes to seek relief from this Court, he must do so by filing a formal motion with the Clerk's Office. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 09/16/2019.(KJA)cc: COR, pro se filer via US Mail (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #15 NOTICE re: Administrative Remedies by Richard Patton, Jr, pro se. (MM) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE re: Administrative Remedies by Richard Patton, Jr, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Remedies, #2 Envelope - Postmarked 8-26-2019)(MM) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #14 Notice, Styled re: Prison Administrative Remedies/Exhaustion "Thwarted" by Richard Patton, Jr., pro se. (KJA) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE Styled re: Prison Administrative Remedies/Exhaustion "Thwarted" by Richard Patton, Jr., pro se. (Attachments: #1 Regional Administrative Remedy dated 5/5/2019, #2 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 08/14/2019)(KJA) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE to Inform the Court that my Attempts at Exhaustion have been "Thwarted." by Richard Patton, Jr., pro se. (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 07/31/2019)(KJA) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: 1. denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. 2. Clerk send Patton blank forms: a. AO 240; and b. EDKY 523. 3. W/I 30 days Patton pay fee or file forms. 4. If Patton fails to take steps, Court will dismiss. 5. Patton keep Clerk informed of mailing address. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/31/19. (SYD)cc: mailed w/forms to pro se filer (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies by Richard Patton, Jr (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Postmark illegible)(MM) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Patton, Jr (KJA) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, #1 Complaint (Referred) (KJA) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Conflict Check run. (KJA) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(KJA) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Richard Patton, Jr., pro se. Mailing envelope attached at DE #1 . (KJA) Modified file date on 7/26/2019 (KJA). (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Patton, Jr., pro se. Mailing envelope attached at DE #1 . Motions referred to P SO. (KJA) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT referred to PSO, filed by Richard Patton, Jr., pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - BOP Health Services Clinical Encounter, #2 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 07/23/2019)(KJA) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less