This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2020 at 16:10:11 (UTC).

Patterson v. Haier US Appliance Solutions Inc

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Patterson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Haier US Appliance Solutions Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Corey L Maze. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00981

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Corey L Maze

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Patterson

Defendant

Haier US Appliance Solutions Inc doing business as GE Appliances

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William R Andrews

Attorney at MARSH RICKARD & BRYAN PC

800 Shades Creek Parkway, Suite 600-D

Birmingham, AL 35209

Richard J Riley

Attorney at MARSH, RICKARD & BRYAN P.C.

800 Shades Creek Parkway, Suite 600-D

Birmingham, AL 35209

Defendant Attorneys

Angel Alece Darmer

Attorney at CARR ALLISON HOWARD OLIVER & SISSON PC

100 Vestavia Parkway

Birmingham, AL 35216

Glenn E Ireland

Attorney at CARR, ALLISON, OLIVER & SISSON, PC

100 Vestavia Parkway, Suite 200

Birmingham, AL 35216

James L Sanders, II

Attorney at SANDERS & WILLIAMS an office of Eraclides Gelman

4501 Pine Tree Circle, 949-5500, Fax: 795-7349

Birmingham, AL 35243

 

Court Documents

7 #3

Exhibit - Ex.3 - Ala. Sec'y State Info for Haier

7 #2

Exhibit - Ex.2 - SJIS Case Detail

7 #1

Exhibit - Ex.1 - Correspondence

#7

(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jason Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex.1 - Correspondence, #2 Exhibit - Ex.2 - SJIS Case Detail, #3 Exhibit - Ex.3 - Ala. Sec'y State Info for Haier)(Riley, Richard) (Entered: 08/09/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Amended MOTION to Stay and terminating as moot #3 MOTION to Stay. The parties are ORDERED to follow the following briefing schedule and requirements related to the motion to remand. All other obligations are STAYED pending further order from the court. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 7/31/2020. (SRD) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#4

(#4) Amended MOTION to Stay re #3 MOTION to Stay Lawsuit until Subject Matter Jurisdiction is Decided by Jason Patterson. (Riley, Richard) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Stay Lawsuit until Subject Matter Jurisdiction is Decided by Jason Patterson. (Riley, Richard) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J Riley on behalf of Jason Patterson (Riley, Richard) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

1 #4

Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #3

Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint

1 #2

Certificate of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Haier US Appliance Solutions Inc from Circuit Court of Clay County, case number 17-CV-2020-900011.00. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Removal, #3 Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(SRD) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jason Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Ex.1 - Correspondence, #2 Exhibit - Ex.2 - SJIS Case Detail, #3 Exhibit - Ex.3 - Ala. Sec'y State Info for Haier)(Riley, Richard) (Entered: 08/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Amended MOTION to Stay and terminating as moot #3 MOTION to Stay. The parties are ORDERED to follow the following briefing schedule and requirements related to the motion to remand. All other obligations are STAYED pending further order from the court. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 7/31/2020. (SRD) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Corey L. Maze: Telephone Conference held on 7/31/2020. (SRD) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER This case is set for a telephone status conference on Friday, July 31, 2020 at 2:00 PM. Call-in information has been emailed to counsel of record. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 7/28/2020. (SRD) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Amended MOTION to Stay re #3 MOTION to Stay Lawsuit until Subject Matter Jurisdiction is Decided by Jason Patterson. (Riley, Richard) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Stay Lawsuit until Subject Matter Jurisdiction is Decided by Jason Patterson. (Riley, Richard) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J Riley on behalf of Jason Patterson (Riley, Richard) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400, receipt number B46011072443 (KEK) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Haier US Appliance Solutions Inc from Circuit Court of Clay County, case number 17-CV-2020-900011.00. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Removal, #3 Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(SRD) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less