This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2023 at 08:28:57 (UTC).

Patterson v. Griffin et al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Patterson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Griffin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are W. Carleton Metcalf and Martin Reidinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00249

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

W. Carleton Metcalf

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald L. Patterson

Defendants

Brent Nicholson

Lowell Griffin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James P. A. Twisdale

Attorney at King Law Offices, PLLC

900 Hendersonville Road, Suite 307

Asheville, NC 28803

Michael Bender

Attorney at King Law Offices, PLLC

364 Butler Rd.

Forest City, NC 28043

Defendant Attorney

Sean F. Perrin

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

301 South College St., Suite 3500

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Henderson County Superior Court File

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court

#2

(#2) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Lowell S. Griffin. (Perrin, Sean) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lowell Griffin. Responses due by 1/2/2023 (Perrin, Sean). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lowell Griffin. (Perrin, Sean) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by James P. A. Twisdale on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Twisdale, James) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER that the deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to the #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Griffin is EXTENDED to and including 1/23/2023. The clerk is RESPECTFULLY DIRECTED to transmit a copy of this Order to Mr. Bender via email and mail to the address(es) shown for him in the public records of the North Carolina State Bar. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to make such filings, on or before 1/23/2023, as are appropriate to clarify Mr. Bender's status as counsel in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/9/2023. (kby) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Plaintiff is DIRECTED to SHOW CAUSE, on or before 2/3/2023, why the undersigned should not consider Plaintiff to have waived any opposition to Defendants #3 Motion to Dismiss. Show Cause Response due by 2/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/27/2023. (hms) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Plaintiff is DIRECTED to SHOW CAUSE, on or before 2/3/2023, why the undersigned should not consider Plaintiff to have waived any opposition to Defendants #3 Motion to Dismiss. Show Cause Response due by 2/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/27/2023. (hms) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER that the deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to the #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Griffin is EXTENDED to and including 1/23/2023. The clerk is RESPECTFULLY DIRECTED to transmit a copy of this Order to Mr. Bender via email and mail to the address(es) shown for him in the public records of the North Carolina State Bar. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to make such filings, on or before 1/23/2023, as are appropriate to clarify Mr. Bender's status as counsel in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/9/2023. (kby) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by James P. A. Twisdale on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Twisdale, James) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketTHIRD Notice to Michael Bender: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Satisfy the Requirements for Admission to the Western District of North Carolina Federal Court. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 1/6/2023. (rth) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lowell Griffin. (Perrin, Sean) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lowell Griffin. Responses due by 1/2/2023 (Perrin, Sean). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketSECOND Notice to Michael Bender: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Satisfy the Requirements for Admission to the Western District of North Carolina Federal Court. Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account Link. (Attorney served via NEF). Extended deadline: 12/22/2022. (maf) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Lowell Griffin answer due 12/20/2022. Text of Order: ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED, and the deadline for Defendant Lowell S. Griffin to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED through and including December 20, 2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 12/1/2022. (kkb) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice to Michael Bender: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Satisfy the Requirements for Admission to the Western District of North Carolina Federal Court. Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 12/7/2022. (khm) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf: #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(khm) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Lowell S. Griffin. (Perrin, Sean) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Henderson County Superior Court, case number 22-CVS-806. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5843729), filed by Lowell S. Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Henderson County Superior Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court)(Perrin, Sean) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less