This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/03/2021 at 08:57:11 (UTC).

Patterson et al v. QBE Specialty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 Patterson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against QBE Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00208

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Jennifer Patterson

James Patterson

Defendant and Counter Claimant

QBE Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Walter A. Schmidlin, III

Attorney at Stewart and Schmidlin, PLLC

P. O. Drawer 120

Smithfield, NC 27577

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Matthew A. Abee

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLC

1320 Main Street, 17Th Floor

Columbia, SC 29201

Robert C. Calamari

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

Bnc Bank Corporate Center, Suite 300, 3751 Robert M. Grissom Parkway

Myrtle Beach, SC 29577

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

12 #1

Exhibit Acknowledgement of Receipt of Notice of Removal

#12

#11

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Declaration of Service

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - State Court Filings

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - October 12, 2020 Letter re Process

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemark - #16 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II for the entry of a scheduling order. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE to Counterclaim for James and Jennifer Patterson filed by James Patterson. (Schmidlin, Walter) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/30/2020. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company of Filing Acknowledgement of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgement of Receipt of Notice of Removal) (Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance filed by Walter A. Schmidlin, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Schmidlin, Walter) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. QBE Specialty Insurance Company answer due 11/30/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/10/2020. Copy sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, Walter A. Schmidlin, III of Stewart, Schmidlin & Bullock, PLLC at P. O. Drawer 120, Smithfield, NC 27577 mailed via US Mail on November 10, 2020. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Service filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company regarding #7 Notice - other . (Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company regarding Notice of Deficiency, . (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Service filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company regarding #1 Notice of Removal, . (Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, Walter A. Schmidlin, III of Stewart, Schmidlin & Bullock, PLLC at P. O. Drawer 120, Smithfield, NC 27577 mailed via US Mail on November 5, 2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal: Counsel has failed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rule 5.3(a). This form can be found on the court's website and can be filed using the event Notice - Other. Counsel should add as attachments any other documents required under Local Rule 5.3(a) that have not already been filed. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: #1 Notice of Removal - Counsel has failed to file a Certificate of Service that specifies the date and manner of service on plaintiff's counsel. Counsel can use the event "Service of Process - Certificate to file the document". (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Robert C. Calamari on behalf of QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Calamari, Robert) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by QBE Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Group Ltd PTY (ASX) for QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew A. Abee on behalf of QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by QBE Specialty Insurance Company from Carteret County Superior Court, case number 20-CVS-834. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5709085), filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - October 12, 2020 Letter re Process, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Filings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration of Service) (Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Adams Abee(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert C Calamari