This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2019 at 07:35:06 (UTC).

Patriot Insurance Company v. Broan-NuTone, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 Patriot Insurance Company filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Broan-NuTone, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrea K. Johnstone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00631

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrea K. Johnstone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patriot Insurance Company

Defendants

NuTone, Inc.

Broan-NuTone, LLC

Nortek, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John P. Sherman

Attorney at Sherman Law PLLC

111 Bow St, Unit #2

Portsmouth, NH 03801

Other Attorneys

Andrew D. Black

Attorney at Smith Duggan Buell & Rufo LLP

55 Old Bedford Rd

Lincoln, MA 01773

 

Court Documents

9 #2

Exhibit 1, Emails

9 #1

Memorandum of Law

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #2

Assignment to Magistrate

4 #1

Notice ECF

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Summons - Waiver Nortek Summons

1 #3

Summons - Waiver NuTone Summons

1 #2

Summons - Waiver Broan-NuTone Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Assented to MOTION to Set Aside #7 Clerk's Entry of Default. Text of Order: Granted. The default against Broan-NuTone, LLC and Nortek, Inc. is stricken. The parties are in agreement that plaintiff will file an amended complaint against Broan-NuTone LLC as the sole defendant. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before August 19, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Assented to MOTION to Set Aside #7 Clerk's Entry of Default. Text of Order: Granted. The default against Broan-NuTone, LLC is stricken. The parties are in agreement that plaintiff will file an amended complaint against Broan-NuTone LLC as the sole defendant. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before August 19, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Assented to MOTION to Set Aside #7 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Broan-NuTone, LLC. Attorney Andrew D. Black added to party Broan-NuTone, LLC(pty:dfltd). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit 1, Emails)(Black, Andrew) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Compliance Local Rule 55.1 (a) by Patriot Insurance Company (Sherman, John) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STRICKEN (see Order dated 8/5/2019) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Broan-NuTone, LLC, Nortek, Inc. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court.(kad) Modified on 8/5/2019 to add: "STRICKEN (see Order dated 8/5/2019)"(kad). (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return of Service Executed as to Nortek, Inc. by Patriot Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 6/24/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sherman, John) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return of Service Executed as to Broan-NuTone, LLC by Patriot Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 6/24/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sherman, John) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summonses issued electronically as to Broan-NuTone, LLC, Nortek, Inc., NuTone, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate) (bt) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (bt) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-631-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement by Patriot Insurance Company disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Sherman, John) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1824517 filed by Patriot Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Broan-NuTone Summons, #3 Summons - Waiver NuTone Summons, #4 Summons - Waiver Nortek Summons)(Sherman, John) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nortek, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NuTone, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Patriot Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where BROAN NUTONE, LLC is a litigant